Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Como TAAA Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Como TAAA Investments, LLC d/b/a Sky Sports Bar & Lounge and d/b/a W1N Grill and Bar, Gaspar Hernandez, William B. Ingram, Jr. and Miguel A. Iracheta
Case Number: 1:2021cv00173
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 21 Opposed MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment by Gaspar Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Tharpe, R)
December 27, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gaspar Hernandez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tharpe, R)
December 23, 2021 Filing 19 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 12/21/2021 re: 12 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
December 23, 2021 Filing 18 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 12/22/2021 re: 13 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
December 23, 2021 Filing 17 Certified Mail Receipt Returned re: 15 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 12/21/2021 re: 14 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Como TAAA Investments, LLC, Gaspar Hernandez, William B. Ingram, Jr, Miguel A. Iracheta () Parties notified.(balvina, 1)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for Entry of Default against All Defendants by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order Entry of Default)(King, Jamie)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Gaspar Hernandez served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/13/2021, filed.(King, Jamie)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Como TAAA Investments, LLC served on 11/20/2021, answer due 12/13/2021, filed.(King, Jamie)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Miguel A. Iracheta served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021, filed.(King, Jamie)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to William B. Ingram, Jr served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021, filed.(King, Jamie)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 1.) Como TAAA Investments, LLC, 2.) Gaspar Hernandez, 3.) William B. Ingram, Jr, 4.) Miguel A. Iracheta. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/1/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(King, Jamie)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27332153) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Como TAAA Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Como TAAA Investments, LLC d/b/a Sky Sports Bar & Lounge and d/b/a W1N Grill and Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaspar Hernandez
Represented By: R Bruce Tharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Ingram, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel A. Iracheta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?