Martinez Gallegos v. Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Martinez Gallegos
Defendant: Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00055
Filed: April 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 14 Certified Mail Receipt Returned re: 13 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (DorinaReyna, 1)
May 22, 2023 Filing 12 Letter to Cameron County Clerk's Office re: Remand, filed. (DorinaReyna, 1)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand. ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Cameron County Court at Law 3 in Cameron County, Texas.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(DorinaReyna, 1)
May 10, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc.. (Novak, Michael)
May 4, 2023 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Juan Manuel Martinez Gallegos, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Perez, Martin)
April 26, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Juan Manuel Martinez Gallegos, filed.(Perez, Martin)
April 26, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc., filed.(Novak, Michael)
April 26, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc., filed.(Novak, Michael)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan recused. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
April 5, 2023 Filing 3 List of Counsel of Record by Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc., filed.(Novak, Michael)
April 5, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc., filed.(Novak, Michael)
April 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cameron County Court at Law No. 3, case number 2023-CCL-00071 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29708272) filed by Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit B- Citation, #4 Exhibit C- Case Summary, #5 Exhibit D- Defendant's Original Answer, #6 Exhibit E- Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Initial and Expert Disclosures)(Novak, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/6/2023) (JenniferLongoria, 1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Gallegos v. Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Martinez Gallegos
Represented By: Martin Leandro Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Maurice Novak
Represented By: Jose De Jesus Trevino, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?