Smith et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Smith and Margarita Smith
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Juanita Hernandez
Case Number: 1:2024cv00061
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Compel.The Court ABATES this action pending arbitration until November 11, 2024, when the Court will hold a status conference.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (dar1)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel ArbitrationMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by Juanita Hernandez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Angelich, Brittney)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (dar1)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Juanita Hernandez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. (Opitz, Justin)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 357th Judicial District Court of Cameron County, TX, case number 2023-DCL-04704 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31575829) filed by Juanita Hernandez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index of State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P) (Opitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Smith
Represented By: Nuru Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Smith
Represented By: Nuru Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Justin Ryan Opitz
Represented By: Brittney Marie Angelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Hernandez
Represented By: Justin Ryan Opitz
Represented By: Brittney Marie Angelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?