Garrett v. Thaler

Plaintiff: Michael Garrett
Defendant: Rick Thaler
Case Number: 2:2013cv00070
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Bee
Presiding Judge: B. Janice Ellington
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 108 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
January 5, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION re: denying 66 MOTION for Sanctions, denying 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment Limited to the Defense of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, 67 Memorandum and Recommendation, (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 23, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION denying 70 Motion for Emergency.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
September 10, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING SECOND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL denying 59 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 9, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
March 13, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel (Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(amireles, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Thaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Thaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?