Broussard v. Stephens et al
Plaintiff: Brad Broussard
Defendant: William Stephens, Eileen Kennedy, Gary Currie, Matt Barber and Carol Monroe
Case Number: 2:2013cv00211
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Bee
Presiding Judge: Jason B. Libby
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 90 Memorandum and Recommendations (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING CONSTRUED REQUEST FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; denying 39 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY. Deft Stephens is ordered to file a statement, within ten days of the date of this Order, indicating whether TDCJ will voluntarily permit Pltff to wear a one-half inch beard while the case is stayed. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION ON PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Grimes, Currie, Barber and Monroe's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), 33 Memorandum and Recommendation. action is DISMISSED as to Defendants Director Joe Grimes, Warden Gary Currie, Warden Matt Barber, and Deputy Director Carol Monroe. Plaintiff's remaining claims for a declaratory judgment and prospective injunctive relief are properly retained against TDCJ-CID Director William Stephens. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Appoint ; granting 20 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. Stephens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?