Ahern v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: John D Ahern
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 2:2014cv00259
Filed: June 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Jason B. Libby
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: 62 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, 65 Memorandum and Recommendation. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 59 MOTION for Default Judgment against United States Of America, 62 MOTION to Dismiss. Objections to M&R due by 6/2/2017(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(jalvarez, 2)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REJECTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: denying 27 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 29 Memorandum and Recommendations (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: OBJECTIONS to 14 Memorandum and Recommendations. The Court refers this matter back to the Magistrate Judge so that he can address the applicability of the FTCA to the alleged actions of the USMS. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahern v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?