Puga et al v. About Tyme Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alexandro Puga and Norma Puga
Defendant: About Tyme Transport, Inc. and Xtra Lease, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00073
Filed: February 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING LIMITED STAY granting 239 Motion to Stay; terminating 242 Motion to Stay. This stay will expire at 5:00 p.m. on January 31, 2018 or on the seventh (7th) day after the Court enters its order on Defendant's post-judgment motion (D.E. 237), whichever is later.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER ON MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OR RECONSIDERATION denying 122 Motion for Clarification.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 113 Motion for Reconsideration.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ON MOTION TO EXCLUDE granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Exclude.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 66 Motion for Leave to File; granting 76 Motion for Continuance.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lcayce, 2)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER OF VENUE denying 9 Motion to Transfer Case ; denying 10 Motion to Transfer Case.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puga et al v. About Tyme Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandro Puga
Represented By: Thomas J Henry
Represented By: Richard W Hunnicutt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Puga
Represented By: Thomas J Henry
Represented By: Richard W Hunnicutt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: About Tyme Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Lyon Krudop
Represented By: David Louis Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xtra Lease, LLC
Represented By: Chaz Daniel Klaes
Represented By: Leslie Dean Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?