Gulf Marine Fabricators, LP v. The ATP Innovator et al
Plaintiff: Gulf Marine Fabricators, LP
Defendant: The ATP Innovator, Amerindo Services Ltd. and Blue Sky Langsa Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00430
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: San Patricio
Presiding Judge: B Janice Ellington
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ON MOTION TO INTERVENE re 39 , 72 , 96 . (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The parties are ORDERED to file their respective motions regarding any claims they may have to the proceeds of the sale of the ATP INNOVATOR as a result of the Court's finding that the ATP INNOVATOR is a vessel on or before July 14, 2018.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER ON MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE granting 85 Motion for Sale of Vessel.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying without prejudice 39 Motion to Intervene.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulf Marine Fabricators, LP v. The ATP Innovator et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Marine Fabricators, LP
Represented By: William C Baldwin
Represented By: Lara Denise Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The ATP Innovator
Represented By: Richard Lee Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerindo Services Ltd.
Represented By: Richard Lee Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Sky Langsa Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?