Swyck v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Gary Swyck
Defendant: Lorie Davis, Kenneth M. Putnam, Jr., Corey Furr, James A McKee, Michael E Alsobrook, Emil Garza, Patricia Chapa and Kimberly Ward
Case Number: 2:2016cv00489
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Brazoria
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 8 47 . The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 42 , DENIES Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion 46 , and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND GRANTING HIM ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE WRITTEN OBJECTIONS denying 49 MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR DEFENCES OBJECTIONS MEDICAL EXAM ( Objections to M&R due by 10/6/2017)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Amend; ORDER Denying 13 Motion for Production of Documents; denying 15 Motion to Appoint ; denying 16 Motion; denying 17 Motion for Leave to File; denying 17 Motion for Discovery; denying 18 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 21 Motion; denying 22 Motion to Appoint. Plaintiff may amend his failure to protect claim on or before February 8, 2017.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(sscotch, 2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swyck v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Swyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Putnam, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Alsobrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emil Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Chapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?