Williams v. In The United States District of The American et al

Plaintiff: Donald Ray Williams, Sr
Defendant: In The United States District of The American, The Attorney General of Texas Insurance Office and Ken Paxton
Case Number: 2:2018cv00047
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Walker
Referring Judge: Jason B Libby
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 21 Memorandum and Recommendations; and DISMISSES this case for failure to prosecute.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
March 5, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
February 14, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court construes this action as a prisoner civil rights action filed pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Therefore, Mr. Williams is ORDERED to pay the $400.00 filing fee in full on or before March 6, 2018 or to file a fully completed m otion to proceed in forma pauperis. In the event Mr. Williams moves to proceed in forma pauperis, Mr. Williams is further ORDERED to show cause on or before March 6, 2018, why he should not be barred from proceeding in forma pauperis pursuant to the three strikes rule.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. In The United States District of The American et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Williams, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In The United States District of The American
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Attorney General of Texas Insurance Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?