Brite Star Remodeling LLC v. American Strategic
Plaintiff: Brite Star Remodeling LLC
Defendant: American Strategic and American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00175
Filed: June 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
County: Nueces
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER entered, re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice #24 . The Court VACATES all settings and deadlines in the case and DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to close the case. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
November 7, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Sean)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER entered. The Court ORDERS the parties to show cause why they failed to comply with the Court's Order by November 13, 2019.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER entered. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement #21 . The Court ORDERS the parties to submit dismissal documents or otherwise inform the Court of the status of this case by November 4, 2019.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Sullivan, Sean)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 Alternative Dispute Resolution Questionnaire provided to all parties of record, filed. (ccassadyadi, 4)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 Alternative Dispute Resolution Memorandum; case not settled, filed.(mserpa, 2)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER entered. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Response to Show Cause Order Dkt. No.17. After review, the Court RESETS the deadline to mediate and submit a mediation report to July 10, 2019. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(csustaeta, 1)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 Joint RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Jones, Bradley)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered. The Court ORDERS the parties to show cause why they failed to comply with the Courts April 10, 2019 Order by June 21, 2019. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Joint Motion to Continue Mediation Deadline. Deadline extended to June 10, 2019.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1) Modified on 4/10/2019 (scavazos, 1).
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Continuance of Mediation Deadline by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER entered. The Court GRANTS IN PART #12 Joint Motion for Continuance. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 7/15/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2019. Mediation due by 5/10/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 9/26/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Hilda G Tagle. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1) Modified on 3/26/2019 (scavazos, 1).
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Continuance of Pretrial Deadlines by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Sean)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Sullivan on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Sullivan, Sean)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corp. identifying ARX Holding Corporation, The Progressive Corporation,and ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP as Corporate Parent, filed.(Detweiler, Keith)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 2 Days. Bench Trial. Statement Regarding Mediation due: 3/25/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 9/28/2018. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/15/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 2/22/2019. Discovery due by 5/15/2019. Mediation due by 3/25/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/30/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/8/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Hilda G Tagle. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Detweiler, Keith)
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Deani Beard Milano on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed. (Milano, Deani)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Jones, Bradley)
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brite Star Remodeling LLC, filed.(Thornhill, Tommy)
July 2, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Strategic Insurance Corp. served on 6/25/2018, answer due 8/24/2018, filed.(Thornhill, Tommy)
July 2, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Jones, Bradley)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER setting deadline. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 9/13/2018. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
June 18, 2018 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corp.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20279894) filed by Brite Star Remodeling LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons in a Civil Action)(Thornhill, Tommy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brite Star Remodeling LLC v. American Strategic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brite Star Remodeling LLC
Represented By: Tommy W Thornhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Douglas D. D'Arche
Represented By: Keith Michael Detweiler
Represented By: Sean Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Deani Beard Milano
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?