Garza et al v. Femco, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nicolas R Garza, Rolando Garza, Consuelo C Garza, Orlando Garza and Corina Garza
Defendant: Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc., Scag Power Equipment, Femco, Inc. and Femco Manufacturing, Inc..
Case Number: 2:2018cv00287
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 25 REPLY in Support of #13 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Consuelo C Garza, Corina Garza, Orlando Garza, Rolando Garza. (Tinning, William)
October 31, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER granting #21 Motion for Daniel Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(srussell, 2)
October 31, 2018 23 Featured Case ORDER granting #20 Motion for Donald Carlson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
October 31, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER granting #19 Motion for Eric D Carlson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
October 30, 2018 21 MOTION for Daniel K. Mullin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc., Scag Power Equipment, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2018. (vrios, 2)
October 30, 2018 20 MOTION for Donald H. Carlson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scag Power Equipment, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2018. (vrios, 2)
October 30, 2018 19 MOTION for Eric D. Carlson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc., Scag Power Equipment, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/20/2018. (vrios, 2)
October 22, 2018 18 Joint RESPONSE to #13 Opposed MOTION to Remand , filed by Femco Manufacturing, Inc.., Femco, Inc., Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc., Scag Power Equipment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Proposed Order)(Blackerby, Chris)
October 15, 2018 17 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 12/14/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 3, 2018 16 PROPOSED ORDER re: #15 MOTION to Expedite Mediation, filed.(Tinning, William)
October 3, 2018 15 MOTION to Expedite Mediation by Consuelo C Garza, Corina Garza, Orlando Garza, Rolando Garza, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2018. (Tinning, William)
October 2, 2018 14 PROPOSED ORDER on Motion to Remand re: #13 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed.(Tinning, William)
October 2, 2018 13 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Consuelo C Garza, Corina Garza, Orlando Garza, Rolando Garza, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A to Mot to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exh B to Mot to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exh C to Mot to Remand, #4 Exhibit Exh D to Mot to Remand, #5 Exhibit Exh E to Mot to Remand, #6 Exhibit Exh F to Mot to Remand)(Tinning, William)
September 27, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc., Scag Power Equipment, filed.(Blackerby, Chris)
September 25, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Consuelo C Garza, Corina Garza, Orlando Garza, Rolando Garza, filed.(Tinning, William)
September 24, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Femco, Inc., filed.(Cowen, Sarah)
September 24, 2018 9 Supplemental SUPPLEMENT by Femco, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplementation to Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibits A3-12, A33 & A65, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-158 Plaintiffs' Ninth Amended Petition (9-12-2018), #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-159 Plaintiffs' Reply to Femco's Man to Designate 3rd Party)(Cowen, Sarah)
September 24, 2018 8 ***DISREGARD*** filed in wrong case . MOTION for Donald H. Carlson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc., Scag Power Equipment, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blackerby, Chris) Modified on 9/24/2018 (lrivera, 2).
September 24, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc., Scag Power Equipment, filed.(Blackerby, Chris)
September 13, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
September 12, 2018 5 Other EXHIBITS by Femco, Inc.. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A151 (pg. 1-200) - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex. A151 (pg. 201-464) - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. A152- A157 - State Court Pleadings)(Cowen, Sarah)
September 12, 2018 4 Other EXHIBITS by Femco, Inc.. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-125 (pg. 1-68) State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex. A-125 (pg. 69-167) State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-125 (pg. 168-229) State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-125 (pg. 230-252) State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit Ex. A-126 - A133 State Court Pleadings, #6 Exhibit Ex. A-134 - A150 - State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit Ex. A-124 - State Court Pleadings)(Cowen, Sarah)
September 12, 2018 3 Other EXHIBITS by Femco, Inc.. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. C - Comer Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex. D - Goodrich Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Ex. E - O'Dea Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. F - Pltfs Disc Reqs to Femco, #5 Exhibit Ex. G - Pltfs Disc Reqs to Metalcraft, #6 Exhibit Ex. H -June 7 2018 email, #7 Exhibit Ex. I - Deposition of of W Webb, #8 Exhibit Emails re. scheduling deposition)(Cowen, Sarah)
September 12, 2018 2 Other EXHIBITS by Femco, Inc.. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-1 thru A-50 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex. A-51 thru A-100 State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-101 thru A-119 State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-120 thru A-123 State Court Pleadings)(Cowen, Sarah)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 229th Judicial District, case number DC-17-97 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20860146) filed by Femco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Index of State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - List of All Counsel of Record and Parties Represented)(Cowen, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza et al v. Femco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas R Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Garza
Represented By: Joseph Michael Guerra
Represented By: William J Tinning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuelo C Garza
Represented By: Joseph Michael Guerra
Represented By: William J Tinning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garza
Represented By: Joseph Michael Guerra
Represented By: William J Tinning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corina Garza
Represented By: Joseph Michael Guerra
Represented By: William J Tinning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalcraft of Mayville, Inc.
Represented By: William A Abernethy
Represented By: Chris A Blackerby
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scag Power Equipment
Represented By: William A Abernethy
Represented By: Donald H Carlson
Represented By: Chris A Blackerby
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Eric D Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Femco, Inc.
Represented By: Rumaldo Solis, Jr
Represented By: Peyton S. Kampas
Represented By: Sarah Pierce Cowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Femco Manufacturing, Inc..
Represented By: Rumaldo Solis, Jr
Represented By: Peyton S. Kampas
Represented By: Sarah Pierce Cowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?