AXA Insurance Company v. Worthington Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: AXA Insurance Company
Defendant: Worthington Industries, Inc., Roper Technologies, Inc., Antek Instruments, Inc. and Worthington Cylinder Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00317
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Worthington Cylinder Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(idavis, 2)
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Worthington Cylinder Corporation, filed.(Sebesta, William)
November 14, 2018 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Antek Instruments, Inc., Roper Technologies, Inc., Worthington Cylinder Corporation filed by AXA Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Roper Technologies, Inc..(lrivera, 2)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER mooting #10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; mooting #22 Motion; granting #24 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
November 14, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION re: Stipulation by AXA Insurance Company, filed.(Sebesta, William)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Any party opposing Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint is ordered to file a response on or before November 13, 2018. Response due by 11/13/2018.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by AXA Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Stern, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Cross-Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Sebesta, William)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed.(Huang, Cathleen)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. #10 Motion to Dismiss. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Dennis, Ronald)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for William T. Nagle to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Cathleen S. Huang to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Richard A. Ergo to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
October 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Cathleen S. Huang to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2018. (Dennis, Ronald)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Richard A. Ergo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/9/2018. (Dennis, Ronald)
October 19, 2018 Corrective Entry: #15 MOTION for Cathleen S. Huang to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #14 MOTION for Richard A. Ergo to Appear Pro Hac Vice was recorded on the wrong docket, filed. Incorrect images attached per R. Ergo's office. (amartinez, 2)
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Willliam "Bill" T. Nagle to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2018. (Dennis, Ronald)
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Cathleen S. Huang to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2018. (Dennis, Ronald)
October 18, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Richard A. Ergo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2018. (Dennis, Ronald)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AXA Insurance Company, filed.(Sebesta, William)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Antek Instruments, Inc., Roper Technologies, Inc., filed.(Cardenas, Victor)
October 16, 2018 *** Motion Docket Date 11/5/2018 re: #10 Motion to Dismiss, filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS re: #10 Memorandum, by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. (Dennis, Ronald)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting MTD)(Dennis, Ronald) Modified on 10/16/2018 (bcortez, 2).
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Antek Instruments, Inc., Roper Technologies, Inc., filed.(Barger, Darrell)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Robert A. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Kristian E Alfonso to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Kristian E. Alfonso to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AXA Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2018. (Sebesta, William)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Robert A. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AXA Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2018. (Sebesta, William)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Removal by Worthington Industries, Inc., filed.(Dennis, Ronald)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(idavis, 2)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 CONSENT to Removal by Antek Instruments, Inc., filed.(Barger, Darrell)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20979090) filed by Roper Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barger, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXA Insurance Company v. Worthington Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Ergo
Represented By: Cathleen S Huang
Represented By: William T. Nagle
Represented By: Ronald Walter Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roper Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Represented By: Victor Luis Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antek Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Represented By: Victor Luis Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Cylinder Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert A Stern
Represented By: Randall J Poelma, Jr
Represented By: William Thomas Sebesta
Represented By: Kristian E Alfonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?