Aransas Princess Condominium Association, Inc. v. Landmark American Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Princess Condominium Association, Inc. and Aransas Princess Condominium Association, Inc.
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00341
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 8 Notice of Appearance and Designation of Lead Counsel by Landmark American Insurance Company, filed.(Brown, Jay)
November 16, 2018 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Landmark American Insurance Company, filed.(Brown, Jay)
November 2, 2018 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Aransas Princess Condominium Association, Inc..(Chriss, William)
October 30, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Landmark American Insurance Company, filed.(Brown, Jay)
October 26, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aransas Princess Condominium Association, Inc., filed.(Chriss, William)
October 15, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER setting deadline. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 12/11/2018. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
October 12, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landmark American Insurance Company, filed.(Brown, Jay)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law #4, Nueces County, Texas, case number 2018CCV-61592-4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21074359) filed by Landmark American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit C-2, #7 Exhibit C-3, #8 Exhibit C-4, #9 Exhibit C-5, #10 Exhibit C-6, #11 Exhibit D)(Brown, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aransas Princess Condominium Association, Inc. v. Landmark American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay W Brown
Represented By: Justin Keith Ratley
Represented By: Bruce Ramsey Wilkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princess Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aransas Princess Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: William John Chriss
Represented By: Kathryn Snapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?