Stevens et al v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Michael S. Frakes, Michael S. Stone, Kent Larry Bakken, Christopher L. Rodriguez, Terry Pennell, Eric Stevens, Lynn E. Kirkpatrick and Ray Moore
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00456
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kent Larry Bakken, Michael S. Frakes, Lynn E. Kirkpatrick, Ray Moore, Terry Pennell, Christopher L. Rodriguez, Eric Stevens, Michael S. Stone, filed.(Hilliard, Robert)
January 22, 2019 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ford Motor Company, filed.(Hampton, Charles)
January 8, 2019 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ford Motor Company served on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019, filed.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
December 21, 2018 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(idavis, 2)
December 20, 2018 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21509863) filed by Michael S. Stone, Michael S. Frakes, Kent Larry Bakken, Christopher L. Rodriguez, Lynn E. Kirkpatrick, Terry Pennell, Eric Stevens, Ray Moore.(Hilliard, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Charles Bedford Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Frakes
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Stone
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Larry Bakken
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Pennell
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stevens
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn E. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Moore
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: John Brandon Martinez
Represented By: Marion M Reilly
Represented By: Rudy Gonzales, Jr
Represented By: Bradford Parker Klager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?