The Port of Corpus Christi LP et al v. Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: The Port of Corpus Christi LP and 361 Holdings LLC
Defendant: Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas and Sean Strawbridge
Case Number: 2:2019cv00022
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN of Service Executed certified mail as to San Patricio County District Clerk on 2/14/19 re: Order on Motion to Remand, filed.(dterrell, 2)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 RECEIPT of Transfer Letter from San Patricio County District Clerk Case # assigned: S-19-5050-CV-B and received on 02/14/2019., filed. (dbenavides, 1)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #3 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and STRIKES AS MOOT #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS the above-captioned case remanded to the 156th District Court of San Patricio County. (Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Preliminary Injunction Order on the Pleadings, or Setting of a Hearing on a Preliminary Injunction and the Extension of the Existing Temporary Restraining Order Pending the Hearing on Preliminary Injunction, filed by 361 Holdings LLC, The Port of Corpus Christi LP. (Jordan, Shelby)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to #6 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand This Removed Case, filed by 361 Holdings LLC, The Port of Corpus Christi LP. (Jordan, Shelby)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, Sean Strawbridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Krams Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Palachek Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion)(George, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 ADVISORY by Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, Sean Strawbridge, filed.(Wotring, Earnest)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, In the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, Sean Strawbridge, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(George, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER Options A-D re: #9 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTIONOpposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed.(Jordan, Shelby)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 2/26/2019.), Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 361 Holdings LLC, The Port of Corpus Christi LP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Shelby)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, Sean Strawbridge, filed.(Wotring, Earnest)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by 361 Holdings LLC, The Port of Corpus Christi LP, filed.(Jordan, Shelby)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, Sean Strawbridge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Remand)(George, William)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #3 Opposed MOTION to Remand Responses due by 1/30/2019. Temporary Restraining Order is extended by agreement of the parties to February 11, 2019.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Wotring, Earnest)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION to Remand by 361 Holdings LLC, The Port of Corpus Christi LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Shelby)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER setting deadline. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 3/18/2019.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 156th District Court of San Patricio County, Texas, case number S-19-5050-CV-B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21678185) filed by Sean Strawbridge, Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Filed, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Original Petition, #3 Exhibit C - Exhibits to State Court Original Petition, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet E - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - List of Counsel)(George, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Port of Corpus Christi LP et al v. Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas
Represented By: William David George
Represented By: James F McKibben, Jr
Represented By: John Muir
Represented By: Debra Tsuchiyama Baker
Represented By: Liza Aguilar Wood
Represented By: Earnest William Wotring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Strawbridge
Represented By: William David George
Represented By: Ashley McKeand Kleber
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Represented By: Gabriel David Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Port of Corpus Christi LP
Represented By: Shelby A Jordan
Represented By: Ben C Broocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 361 Holdings LLC
Represented By: Shelby A Jordan
Represented By: Ben C Broocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?