United States of America for the Use of Luhr Bros., Inc. v. Worley Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE OF LUHR BROS., INC.
Defendant: CRYSTALLINE DEVELOPMENT, LLC, Suretec Insurance Company, WORLEY SERVICES, INC. a/k/a WORLEY TREE SERVICES, INC., Worley Services, Inc. and Worley Tree Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00074
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Hilda G Tagle
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suretec Insurance Company identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Carter, Andrew)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Worley Services, Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019, filed.(Jasper, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Crystalline Development, LLC served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019, filed.(Jasper, Jennifer)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Suretec Insurance Company served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019, filed.(Jasper, Jennifer)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Suretec Insurance Company, filed.(Carter, Andrew)
March 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Crystalline Development, LLC, Suretec Insurance Company, Worley Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(idavis, 2)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Suretec Insurance Company, filed.(Jasper, Jennifer)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Worley Services, Inc., filed.(Jasper, Jennifer)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Crystalline Development, LLC, filed.(Jasper, Jennifer)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting deadline. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 6/4/2019.(Signed by Judge Hilda G Tagle) Parties notified.(scavazos, 1)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America for the Use of Luhr Bros., Inc., filed.(Jasper, Jennifer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22005892) filed by United States of America for the Use of Luhr Bros., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jasper, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use of Luhr Bros., Inc. v. Worley Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYSTALLINE DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suretec Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Francis Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLEY SERVICES, INC. a/k/a WORLEY TREE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worley Tree Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR THE USE OF LUHR BROS., INC.
Represented By: Jennifer D Jasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?