Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Ramon et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing, Peermusic III Ltd, Foreign Imported Productions and Publishing, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Defendant: Veronica Ramon and Adolfo Ramon, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00131
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Foreign Imported Productions and Publishing, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing, Peermusic III Ltd, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Davison, Dan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Foreign Imported Productions and Publishing, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing, Peermusic III Ltd, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., filed.(Davison, Dan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge David S Morales. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (bcortez, 2)
May 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants 5/7/19. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Copyright Form by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Foreign Imported Productions and Publishing, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing, Peermusic III Ltd, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., filed. (Davison, Dan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summons)(Davison, Dan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Foreign Imported Productions and Publishing, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing, Peermusic III Ltd, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., filed.(Davison, Dan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22379108) filed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Foreign Imported Productions and Publishing, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing, Peermusic III Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davison, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Ramon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peermusic III Ltd
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foreign Imported Productions and Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Philip Alexander Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Ramon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?