Conner v. Collier

Plaintiff: Jo Ann Conner
Defendant: Faith Collier
Case Number: 2:2019cv00142
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jo Ann Conner, filed.(Choi, Dong)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Faith Collier, filed.(Farmer, William)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
May 23, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Notice (Other),, receipt number HOU088772, filed. (mmapps, 4)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT by Faith Collier, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record)(Farmer, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Conner
Represented By: Dong Hee Choi
Represented By: Thomas Jude Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Collier
Represented By: William David Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?