Skolnik v. Davis
Petitioner: Brian Skolnik
Respondent: Bryan Collier and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 2:2019cv00163
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORDS by Lorie Davis, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Br., #2 State's Br., #3 Appellant's Reply Br.)(Meador, Jon)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support Motions referred to Jason B Libby. by Lorie Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meador, Jon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS by Lorie Davis, filed. (Attachments: #1 SHCR-01, #2 mandate issd, #3 CCA Grant Out-of-Time PDR, #4 Action Taken, #5 Mot. for Ext., #6 Mot. for Ext., #7 Mot. for Ext., #8 Pro Se Req. for Counsel, #9 CCA Order on Remand, #10 Pro Se Corres. re. Status, #11 FoF CoL, #12 SHCR-02, #13 Skolnik Concurring Op. Iss'd, #14 Skolnik Concurring Op Iss'd, #15 CCA Op. Remand Ord.)(Meador, Jon)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon R. Meador on behalf of Lorie Davis, filed. (Meador, Jon)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR SERVICE ON TX ATTORNEY GENERAL (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) (Attachments: #1 copy of petition (D.E. 1)) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
June 24, 2019 Habeas Corpus Filing fee: $5.00 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, receipt number CC014994, filed. (dterrell, 2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (AmandaZepeda, 2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (AmandaZepeda, 2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Brian Skolnik. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 6/30/2019, filed. (AmandaZepeda, 2)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Brian Skolnik. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AmandaZepeda, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skolnik v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Represented By: Jon R Meador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Skolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?