CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC v. Alice Motor Company, LLC
Plaintiff: CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC as successor-in-interest to Carstar Franchise Systems, Inc. and Carstar Franchisor SPV, LLC
Defendant: Alice Motor Company, LLC dba Carstar Collision of Alice and Alice Motor Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00219
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Carstar Franchisor SPV, LLC, filed.(Ortiz, Jose)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Carstar Franchisor SPV, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ortiz, Jose)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alice Motor Company, LLC, filed.(Davis, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alice Motor Company, LLC, filed.(Davis, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Carstar Franchisor SPV, LLC by Alice Motor Company, LLC, filed.(Davis, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carstar Franchisor SPV, LLC, filed.(Ortiz, Jose)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alice Motor Company, LLC served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019, filed.(Ortiz, Jose)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Mitchell Robiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Dennis Leone to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)
August 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Alice Motor Company, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC as successor-in-interest to Carstar Franchise Systems, Inc., filed.(Ortiz, Jose)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Dennis Leone to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC as successor-in-interest to Carstar Franchise Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/27/2019. (Ortiz, Jose)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Mitchell Robiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC as successor-in-interest to Carstar Franchise Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/27/2019. (Ortiz, Jose)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alice Motor Company, LLC dba Carstar Collision of Alice, filed.(Ortiz, Jose)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alice Motor Company, LLC dba Carstar Collision of Alice (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22922644) filed by CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC as successor-in-interest to Carstar Franchise Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ortiz, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC v. Alice Motor Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CarStar Franchisor SPV LLC as successor-in-interest to Carstar Franchise Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carstar Franchisor SPV, LLC
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ortiz
Represented By: Shelby A Jordan
Represented By: Mitchell Robiner
Represented By: Dennis Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Motor Company, LLC dba Carstar Collision of Alice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Motor Company, LLC
Represented By: Matthew K Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?