The United States of America v. Carter's Contracting Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The United States Of America
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company Mutual, The United States of America ex rel. Rota Reese Enterprises, LLC and Carter's Contracting Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00251
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Merchants Bonding Company Mutual, filed. (Crews, Richard)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Carter's Contracting Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Hoelscher, Jon)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carter's Contracting Services, Inc., filed.(Hoelscher, Jon)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Merchants Bonding Company Mutual, filed.(Crews, Richard)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by The United States Of America on 09/11/2019 re: Plaintiff's Original Complaint, filed.(Ensley, Karen)
August 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Merchants Bonding Company Mutual. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Ensley, Karen)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carter's Contracting Services, Inc., Merchants Bonding Company Mutual (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23066122) filed by The United States of America ex rel. Rota Reese Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ensley, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. Carter's Contracting Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Bonding Company Mutual
Represented By: Richard White Crews, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America ex rel. Rota Reese Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Karen Lynn Ensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter's Contracting Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Paul Hoelscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States Of America
Represented By: Karen Lynn Ensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?