Kelley et al v. Fisher-Price Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Kelly, Joshua Kelley and Jaclyn Kelley
Defendant: Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price Inc. and Amy Renee Williams
Case Number: 2:2019cv00359
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #8 MOTION for Reconsideration of #7 Order on Motion to Remand MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jaclyn Kelley, Joshua Kelley, filed.(Wexler, Noah)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration of #7 Order on Motion to Remand ( Motion Docket Date 2/6/2020.), MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jaclyn Kelley, Joshua Kelley, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wexler, Noah)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Fisher-Price Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fisher-Price Inc., Mattel, Inc., filed.(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Jaclyn Kelley, Joshua Kelley, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wexler, Noah)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fisher-Price Inc., Mattel, Inc., filed.(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County District Court, case number 2019DCV-5155-H (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23661348) filed by Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al v. Fisher-Price Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattel, Inc.
Represented By: Mary-Olga Lovett
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher-Price Inc.
Represented By: Mary-Olga Lovett
Represented By: Hiba Kazim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Renee Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Kelley
Represented By: Noah Michael Wexler
Represented By: Jason Aron Itkin
Represented By: Christopher Jake Balser
Represented By: John Benjamin Bireley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaclyn Kelley
Represented By: Noah Michael Wexler
Represented By: Jason Aron Itkin
Represented By: Christopher Jake Balser
Represented By: John Benjamin Bireley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?