Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC v. Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC
Defendant: B NO. 240 CORP., Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. and Barge B NO 240
Case Number: 2:2019cv00370
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Julie K Hampton
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend Order. Amending Order {16]. Copy of Order forwarded to USM Corpus Christi(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(lrivera, 2)
February 3, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed.(Guy, Matthew)
January 31, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc., filed.(Buchanan, James)
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 Second MOTION to Amend #16 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motions referred to Julie K Hampton. by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guy, Matthew)
January 28, 2020 ***Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton (AnnSalazar, 2)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference se for 3/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Julie K. Hampton. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(AnnSalazar, 2)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #20 Motion to Amend: While the vessel remains in custody, Plaintiff must identify the name(s) of any substitute custodians(s). Plaintiffs motion does not include the names(s), but instead seeks an order generally appointing the current master and current relief master as substitute custodian(s) of the vessel. This is insufficient..(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend #16 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motions referred to Julie K Hampton. by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guy, Matthew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc., filed.(Buchanan, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN of Service on 1/20/20 re: process receipt and return, filed.(dterrell, 2)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE. Pursuant to Special Order No. C-2019-4, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton. Magistrate Judge B. Janice Ellington is no longer assigned to the case. All deadlines remain in effect. Parties Notified. (NicoleDiaz, 4)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appoint Tug Barbara E. Bouchard Corp. and the B. No. 240 Corp., through the master, Thomas Rowley, and relief master, Michael Larsen, of the M/V Barbara E. Bouchard as custodian of Barge B No. 240.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint the Master and Relief Master of the M/V BARBARA E. BOUCHARD as Substitute Custodian of Barge B NO. 240Motions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delaration of Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order)(Guy, Matthew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by B NO. 240 CORP., filed.(Buchanan, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service Executed as to Barbara bouchard on 12/12/2019 re: Process Receipt and Return, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 Seize Vessel WARRANT issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington), filed.Certified copy sent to USMS(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion.(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington)Certified copies sent to USMS Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Amend Order and WarrantMotions referred to B Janice Ellington. by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Order for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest, #2 Exhibit Amended Warrant to Seize Vessel)(Guy, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Seize a Vessel WARRANT issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Order sent to USMS, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion. Certified copy sent to USMS(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion. Certified copy sent to USMS(Signed by Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Warrant to Sieze a Vessel by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed.(Guy, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B Janice Ellington. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/10/2019. Mr. Guy provided the court with an update. Mr. Guy will be filing a proposed arrest warrant order. The Court has granted the motion for arrest warrant. Order will be signed shortly. Appearances: Matthew Charles Guy.(Digital # 10:33-10:40)(ERO:F. Carbia), filed.(legarza, 2)
December 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dterrell, 2)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Guy, Matthew)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Allow Vessel Movement by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guy, Matthew)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Vessel Arrest by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guy, Matthew)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc., filed.(Guy, Matthew)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23723526) filed by Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC.(Guy, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC v. Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B NO. 240 CORP.
Represented By: James F Buchanan
Represented By: Marshall Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bouchard Transportation Co., Inc.
Represented By: James F Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barge B NO 240
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Charles Guy
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?