First York Financial, LLC v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: First York Financial, LLC
Defendant: Irmalinda Gonzales, Patricia A Evans, Hilario De Leon and Irmalinda De Leon
Case Number: 2:2020cv00209
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of financially interested persons by Patricia A Evans, filed. (Johnson, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Patricia A Evans, filed.(Johnson, Robert)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment against Hilario De Leon, Irmalinda Gonzales by First York Financial, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 Clerks ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Hilario De Leon, Irmalinda Gonzales Parties notified.(jmarks, 2)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Patricia A Evans 9/25/2020.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER striking #12 Motion for Default Judgment. Failing to comply: Filing a motion for default judgment from the Court before the Clerk has entered the default.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian N. Lopez on behalf of First York Financial, LLC, filed. (Lopez, Vivian)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED FIRST MOTION (but 2nd Request) for Extension of Time to File an Answer. by Patricia A Evans, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vrios, 2)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 STRIKING PER DE #15 MOTION for Default Judgment against Hilario De Leon, Irmalinda Gonzales by First York Financial, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark) Modified on 9/21/2020 (legarza, 2).
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Hilario De Leon, Irmalinda Gonzales by First York Financial, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation. Defendant to file an Answer on or before 9/18/2020.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re: (Joint) Extending Answer Date for Patricia A. Evans, by First York Financial, LLC, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hilario De Leon served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Irmalinda Gonzales served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Patricia A Evans served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(RochelleLimon, 2)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by First York Financial, LLC, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25068517) filed by First York Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First York Financial, LLC v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irmalinda Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A Evans
Represented By: Robert W Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilario De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irmalinda De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First York Financial, LLC
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Vivian Nahir Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?