Great American Insurance Company v. Montez Electric, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Montez Electric, Inc., Zulema Montez and Gabriel Montez
Case Number: 2:2020cv00211
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Drew B Tipton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Entry of Default against All Defendants by Great American Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Pipkin, Mike)
September 28, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference reset for 11/6/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Drew B Tipton. Zoom link will be sent by email to all parties. (KelliePapaioannou, 2)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service-G. Montez, #2 Return of Service-Z. Montez)(Pipkin, Mike)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 G. Montez Summons, #2 Z. Montez Summons)(Pipkin, Mike)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Great American Insurance Company, filed.(Pipkin, Mike)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 11:00 AM by video conference before Judge Drew B Tipton. Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25077044) filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pipkin, Mike)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. Montez Electric, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montez Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zulema Montez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Montez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jadyn Christina Cleveland
Represented By: Mike F Pipkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?