Cavazos et al v. Orion Marine Group, LLC et al: DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED.
Plaintiff: Karla Cavazos, Arturo Cavazos and Bertha Cavazos
Defendant: EPIC Midstream Holdings GP, LLC, Orion Construction, L.P., Orion Marine Construction, Inc., EPIC Midstream Holdings, LP, Enterprise Products Partners L.P., EPIC Crude Holdings, LP, Enterprise Products Operating LLC, Orion Marine Group, LLC and EPIC Crude Terminal Company, LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv00248
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REMAND granting #3 MOTION to Remand (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(legarza, 2) CERTIFIED ORDER SENT BY FED EX. Modified on 12/15/2020 (legarza, 2).
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Keltner on behalf of Enterprise Products Operating LLC, Enterprise Products Partners L.P., filed. (Keltner, David)
December 7, 2020 Appearance Information for 1/14/2021 Hearing: All parties will appear by Zoom. Parties can connect to our courtroom at: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1617458859 or by dialing 1 669 254 5252 or 1 646 828 7666; Meeting ID: 161 745 8859. All parties MUST MUTE their audio if they are not speaking. Parties must be logged into Zoom at least 15 minutes prior to hearing start time. Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. , filed. (bcortez, 2)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by FELA OLIVAREZ on behalf of Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, filed. (Guerra, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Remand, filed by Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos. (Brunkenhoefer, Robert)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Remand, filed by Enterprise Products Operating LLC, Enterprise Products Partners L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noble, Brooke)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, filed.(Guerra, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Orion Construction, L.P., Orion Marine Construction, Inc., Orion Marine Group, LLC, filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Orion Construction, L.P., Orion Marine Construction, Inc., Orion Marine Group, LLC, filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Enterprise Products Operating LLC, Enterprise Products Partners L.P., filed.(Hoffman, Matthew)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Arturo Cavazos, Bertha Cavazos, Karla Cavazos, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2020. (Brunkenhoefer, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
October 6, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos (ChristinaAvila, 2)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nueces County Court at Law 3, case number 2020CCV-61221-3 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25299621) filed by Enterprise Products Operating LLC, Enterprise Products Partners L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noble, Brooke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavazos et al v. Orion Marine Group, LLC et al: DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC Midstream Holdings GP, LLC
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Construction, L.P.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Marine Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC Midstream Holdings, LP
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Products Partners L.P.
Represented By: Hector Canales
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Represented By: Michael G Terry
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Brooke Ashley Noble
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Represented By: David Evans Keltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC Crude Holdings, LP
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Products Operating LLC
Represented By: Hector Canales
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Represented By: Michael G Terry
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Brooke Ashley Noble
Represented By: Patrick W Mizell
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Represented By: David Evans Keltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Marine Group, LLC
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC Crude Terminal Company, LP
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Cavazos
Represented By: Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Michael Matthew Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Cavazos
Represented By: Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Michael Matthew Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Cavazos
Represented By: Robert Blake Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Michael Matthew Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?