Ron Hoover Companies of Corpus Christi, Inc. v. Villalobos
Plaintiff: Ron Hoover Companies of Corpus Christi, Inc. d/b/a Ron Hoover RB & Marine of Corpus Christi and Ron Hoover Companies Of Corpus Christi, Inc. doing business as Ron Hoover RV & Marine Of Corpus Christi As Owner and Operator of The Epic CAT 26 Exoneration From or Limitation Of Liability
Defendant: Alberto Villalobos
Case Number: 2:2020cv00257
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Appearance Information for 1/14/2021 Hearing: All parties will appear by Zoom. Parties can connect to our courtroom at: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1617458859 or by dialing 1 669 254 5252 or 1 646 828 7666; Meeting ID: 161 745 8859. All parties MUST MUTE their audio if they are not speaking. Parties must be logged into Zoom at least 15 minutes prior to hearing start time. Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. , filed. (bcortez, 2)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPROVING LIMITATION PLAINTIFFS STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND LIMITATION BOND, AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Claims due by 1/6/2021(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(sylopez, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2020: #1 Notice) (bcortez, 2).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(BrittanyPainschab, 2)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alberto Villalobos (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25375152) filed by Ron Hoover Companies of Corpus Christi, Inc. d/b/a Ron Hoover RB & Marine of Corpus Christi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Exhibit Exh E, #6 Exhibit Exh F, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ron Hoover Companies of Corpus Christi, Inc. v. Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Hoover Companies of Corpus Christi, Inc. d/b/a Ron Hoover RB & Marine of Corpus Christi
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Hoover Companies Of Corpus Christi, Inc. doing business as Ron Hoover RV & Marine Of Corpus Christi As Owner and Operator of The Epic CAT 26 Exoneration From or Limitation Of Liability
Represented By: Krystie Nicole Cals
Represented By: Trenton J Wallis
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?