Alvarado v. Minerva Marine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pascual Alvarado
Defendant: Alexandra Maritime, SA and Minerva Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00314
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot without prejudice #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot without prejudice #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants may file a responsive pleading or Rule 12 motion no later than March 15, 2021.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pascual Alvarado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sigler, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alexandra Maritime, SA, Minerva Marine, Inc. filed by Pascual Alvarado.(Sigler, Robert)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Agreed Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and/or amend his complaint is 2/26/21. Defendants' deadline to reply to Plaintiff's responses is March 12, 2021.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiff's Response and Defendants' Replies Concerning Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Pascual Alvarado, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sigler, Robert)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alexandra Maritime, SA, Minerva Marine, Inc., filed.(Lowrance, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alexandra Maritime, SA, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Lowrance, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Minerva Marine, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lowrance, Christopher)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pascual Alvarado, filed.(Sigler, Robert)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2021 at 10:45 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 347th Judicial District Nueces County, Texas, case number 2020DCV-3087-H (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25733896) filed by Alexandra Maritime, SA, Minerva Marine, Inc..(Lowrance, Christopher)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal by Alexandra Maritime, SA, Minerva Marine, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Filed, #2 Exhibit A-1a, #3 Exhibit A-1b, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit A-4)(Lowrance, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. Minerva Marine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Maritime, SA
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Lowrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerva Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Lowrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascual Alvarado
Represented By: Juan P. Reyna
Represented By: Mikell Alan West
Represented By: Robert John Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?