U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Awon Phie LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Awon Phie LLC and Awon Phie LLC doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites
Case Number: 2:2021cv00012
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, filed.(Rajendran, Esha)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Awon Phie LLC served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021, filed.(Rajendran, Esha)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:15 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rajendran, Esha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Awon Phie LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Esha Rajendran
Represented By: Edward Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awon Phie LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awon Phie LLC doing business as Holiday Inn Express & Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?