Brown Water Marine Service, Inc. v. T.W. LaQuay Marine, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brown Water Marine Service, Inc.
Defendant: T.W. LaQuay Marine, LLC and Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00023
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT- Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (D.E. 4), the Court enters final judgment dismissing this action.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Dismissal as to T.W. LaQuay Marine, LLC, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America by Brown Water Marine Service, Inc., filed. (Partridge, John "Jack")
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brown Water Marine Service, Inc., filed.(Partridge, John "Jack")
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(RochelleLimon, 2)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T.W. LaQuay Marine, LLC, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25977582) filed by Brown Water Marine Service, Inc..(Partridge, John "Jack")

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown Water Marine Service, Inc. v. T.W. LaQuay Marine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.W. LaQuay Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Water Marine Service, Inc.
Represented By: John "Jack&quot C. Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?