Anderson v. FCA US, LLC
Plaintiff: Chrystene Faye Deelyn Anderson
Defendant: FCA US, LLC and Chrysler Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00078
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Drew B Tipton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 7/14/2021.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(grogan, 2)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FCA US, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint)(Slobin, Cary)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to FCA US, LLC served on 4/28/2021, answer due 6/14/2021, filed.(Cook, Louie)
May 20, 2021 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 11:15 AM in by video before Judge Drew B Tipton (KelliePapaioannou, 2)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint ; Answer due for FCA US, LLC 6/14/2021(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FCA US, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slobin, Cary)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to FCA US, LLC served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021, filed.(Cook, Louie)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to FCA US, LLC, filed.(Cook, Louie)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26326685) filed by Chrystene Faye Deelyn Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Cook, Louie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrystene Faye Deelyn Anderson
Represented By: Louie Jefferson Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?