Sopuch III v. BBVA USA et al;
Plaintiff: John A. Sopuch III
Defendant: Michael L. Gaubert, BBVA USA and BBVA Compass
Case Number: 2:2021cv00083
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Remand; the Court GRANTS Sopuchs motion to remand. This action is remanded to the 148th Judicial District Court of Nueces County, Texas. The Court DENIES Sopuchs request for attorneys fees.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
June 17, 2021 *** Zoom information for 7/1/21 hearing: All parties will appear by Zoom. Parties can connect to our courtroom at: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1617458859. All parties MUST MUTE their audio if they are not speaking. Parties must be logged into Zoom at least 15 minutes prior to hearing start time. Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted., filed. (bcortez, 2)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Remand filed by BBVA USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Hanson, Thomas)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division by BBVA USA, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Proposed Order)(Hanson, Thomas)
April 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by John A. Sopuch III, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2021. (Sopuch, John)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by BBVA USA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Index of State Court Action Pleadings, #2 Identification of Parties and Counsel)(Troiano, Daniel)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BBVA USA identifying BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc; Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Troiano, Daniel)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BBVA USA, filed.(Troiano, Daniel)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 148th Judicial District Court, Nueces County, case number 2021DCV-0108-E (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26346239) filed by BBVA USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - Supplemental)(Troiano, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sopuch III v. BBVA USA et al;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Sopuch III
Represented By: John Augustine Sopuch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Gaubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA USA
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Represented By: Thomas Mott Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Represented By: Thomas Mott Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?