Thompson v. Lumpkin et al
Plaintiff: Overille Denton Thompson, Jr.
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin and Texas Department Of Criminal Justice Correctional Institutions Division
Case Number: 2:2021cv00154
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Julie K Hampton
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Overille Denton Thompson, Jr. re: Payment of Filing Fee of $402.00, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (fcarbia, 2)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SERVICE ON TX ATTORNEY GENERAL (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) (Attachments: #1 Original Comlpaint, #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction) Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
August 24, 2021 Full Filing fee: $402.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number CC017378, filed. (vrios, 2)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Motions referred to Julie K Hampton, by Overille Denton Thompson, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(NeldaGarcia, 2)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER; Plaintiff must pay $402 filing fee by 8/27/2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(amartinez, 2)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Overille Denton Thompson, Jr. Within 20 Days of this notice, the plaintiff must file a filing fee of $402.00 for actions filed under 42 U.S.C. 1983 or a fully complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; Submit a certified copy of the trust fund account statement. Parties notified., filed. (RochelleLimon, 2)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (RochelleLimon, 2)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RochelleLimon, 2)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Overille Denton Thompson, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2021. (RochelleLimon, 2).
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Bobby Lumpkin, Texas Department Of Criminal Justice Correctional Institutions Division (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Overille Denton Thompson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(RochelleLimon, 2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Lumpkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overille Denton Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department Of Criminal Justice Correctional Institutions Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?