Herrley et al v. Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Plaintiff: Christine Herrley, Christine Herrley as Representative of the Estate of August Herrley, deceased, Tabitha Sue Herrley and August Leo Herrley II
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00158
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, filed.(Bueche, Ryan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, filed.(Grafton, Richard)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Christine Herrley, Tabitha Sue Herrley, August Leo Herrley II, filed.(Mares, Jorge)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Daimler Trucks North America LLC served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021, filed.(Mares, Jorge)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Daimler Trucks North America LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. Parties notified.(JessieHutchinson, 2)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Daimler Trucks North America LLC, filed.(Mares, Jorge)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26822045) filed by August Leo Herrley II, Christine Herrley, Tabitha Sue Herrley, Christine Herrley as Representative of the Estate of August Herrley, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mares, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrley et al v. Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Herrley
Represented By: Jorge Luiz Mares
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Represented By: Mikal C Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Herrley as Representative of the Estate of August Herrley, deceased
Represented By: Jorge Luiz Mares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Sue Herrley
Represented By: Jorge Luiz Mares
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Represented By: Mikal C Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August Leo Herrley II
Represented By: Jorge Luiz Mares
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Represented By: Mikal C Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: Richard Harley Grafton
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Bueche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?