Guy v. Hooper et al
Plaintiff: Walter Kevin Guy
Defendant: Sheriff J.C. Hooper, Anderson and Sgt Lopez
Case Number: 2:2022cv00031
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Julie K Hampton
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO DISMISS CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE re: #1 Complaint (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(RochelleLimon, 2)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of non-consent to Magistrate Judge by Walter Kevin Guy, filed. (rkonieczny, 4)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Walter Kevin Guy. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 3/16/2022, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Walter Kevin Guy, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/7/2022. (BrittanyPainschab, 2)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Anderson, J.C. Hooper, Lopez (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Walter Kevin Guy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BrittanyPainschab, 2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy v. Hooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Kevin Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff J.C. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?