Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC v. Aetna, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC D/B/A 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory and Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC doing business as 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory
Defendant: Aetna, Inc., Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Meritain Health, Inc., First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, Ge Global Health Plan, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Oprona, Inc. Dba Rosen USA, INC, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan and Oprona, Inc. doing business as Rosen USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00127
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2023 Filing 58 FINAL JUDGMENT (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE denying #52 Amended Motion; denying #52 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2)
March 29, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #53 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,, by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Hunt, Laura)
March 24, 2023 Filing 55 REPLY in Support of #52 AMENDED MOTION MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC. (Ebad, Khan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE OF INTENTION TO FILE REPLY re: #52 AMENDED MOTION MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed. (Ebad, Khan)
March 17, 2023 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition to #52 AMENDED MOTION MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan. (Hunt, Laura)
February 24, 2023 Filing 52 AMENDED MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/17/2023.), MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ebad, Khan)
February 10, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Ebad, Khan)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
January 4, 2023 Status conference set for 1/11/2023 is canceled. Hearing to be reset after ruling on pending motion. (bcortez, 2)
December 30, 2022 Filing 49 SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT to #47 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Surreply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, filed by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan.(fcarbia, 2)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
December 29, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Surreply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Surreply, #2 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura)
December 23, 2022 Filing 46 SURREPLY to #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC. (Ebad, Khan)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR REPLY REGARDING RESPONDENTS MOTION TO DISMISS [DOC. 29] AND DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF [DOC. 43] - granting #44 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply ; Motion-related deadline set re: #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Replies due by 12/23/2022)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(legarza, 2)
December 22, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ebad, Khan)
December 16, 2022 Filing 43 REPLY in Support of #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan. (Hunt, Laura)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND THE PAGE LIMIT FOR THEIR REPLY BRIEF granting #41 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
December 6, 2022 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan Defendants List, #2 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura)
November 11, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Ebad, Khan)
November 10, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/10/2022. Parties give summary of case. There is pending motion to dismiss. Parties agree to not enter the scheduling order until and order on the motion to dismiss is entered. Status Conference set for 1/11/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Appearances: Laura B. Hunt, David Baird Carpenter, Khan Ebad.(Digital # 9:45-9:54)(ERO:F. Carbia), filed.(bcortez, 2)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss #29 is due on or before 12/16/2022.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2)
November 3, 2022 Filing 38 ***TIME CHANGE ONLY*** NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 09:45 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos, filed. Parties had previously agreed to appear by Zoom. Zoom instructions remain the same. (bcortez, 2)
November 3, 2022 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan Defendants List, #2 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #29 . Responses due by 11/11/2022.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2)
November 2, 2022 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ebad, Khan)
November 2, 2022 *** All parties have agreed to appear by Zoom for the IPTC on 11/10/22 at 9:00 a.m. Parties can connect to our courtroom at: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1617458859; Meeting ID: 161 745 8859; Dial by your location: 1 669 254 5252, 1 646 828 7666, or 1 669 216 1590; Join by SIP: 1617458859@sip.zoomgov.com. All parties must mute their audio if they are not speaking. Parties must be logged into Zoom at least 15 minutes prior to hearing start time. Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. , filed. (bcortez, 2)
October 27, 2022 Filing 34 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan Defendants List)(Hunt, Laura)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,( Replies due by 11/23/2022).(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2)
October 21, 2022 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and Notice of Intent to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan Defendants List, #2 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to File Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/3/2022.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2)
October 17, 2022 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to File Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Ebad, Khan)
September 29, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Health Benefit Plan, Costco Employee Benefits Program, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte LLP Group Insurance Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Lydondell Basell Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Collabera Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura)
September 29, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell L. Barger on behalf of Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, filed. (Barger, Darrell)
August 29, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed.(Hunt, Laura)
August 29, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David Carpenter, Emily Costin, Laura Hunt on behalf of Group Health & Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, filed. (Hunt, Laura)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Grants #24 Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (Joint Plan due by 10/27/2022., Initial Conference reset for 11/10/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2)
August 25, 2022 Filing 24 Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Emily Seymour Costin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(bcortez, 2)
August 19, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Emily Seymour Costin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2022. (Hunt, Laura)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for David B. Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(AnnSalazar, 2)
August 19, 2022 Filing 20 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Group Health & Welfare Plan served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 18, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for David Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2022. (Hunt, Laura)
August 18, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura B. Hunt on behalf of ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. (Hunt, Laura)
August 16, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust served on 8/16/2022, answer due 10/17/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Stipulation of Substitution of Parties by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 stipulation of sub Collabera, #2 stipulation of sub Costco, #3 stipulation of sub HCA, #4 stipulation of sub Lyondell, #5 stipulation of sub Mitsubishi)(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022; Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022; American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022; American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022; Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022; Arkema INC. Health Plan served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Meritain Health, Inc. served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to First Health Life & Health Insurance Company served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna, Inc. served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Health Management, LLC served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Health Insurance Company served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Health Inc. served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
August 12, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc served on 7/31/2022, answer due 9/29/2022, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
June 29, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC, filed.(Ebad, Khan)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/22/2022) (SashaOzuna, 2). (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/24/2022) (SashaOzuna, 2).
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan, Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan, Arkema INC. Health Plan, C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan, Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan, Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan, Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan, Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan, Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan, Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan, Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust, First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan, Hilton Worldwide Health Plan, Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan, Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan, International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan, Invesco Health Plan, Iqvia Inc. Health Plan, Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees, Magellan Health & Welfare Plan, Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan, Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan, Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan, Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan, Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans, Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan, Sap America Health & Welfare Plan, Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan, Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan, The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan, Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan, Trinet Group, Inc., Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan, United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan, William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons)(Ebad, Khan)
June 15, 2022 Summons Issued as to ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Oprona, Inc., Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, Accenture United States Group Health Plan, Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc, Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., Aetna Health Insurance Company, Aetna Health Management, LLC, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC, Aetna, Inc., Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan, American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan, Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan, AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan, CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust, Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust, Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan, Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan, Exxon Mobil Medical Plan, Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan, First Health Life & Health Insurance Company, GT Services LLC Medical Insurance, Ge Global Health Plan, Group Health & Welfare Plan, Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan, Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan, Invesco Health Plan, KPMG LLP Health Plans., Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan, Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust, Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan, Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan, Meritain Health, Inc., Oprona, Inc. Dba Rosen USA, INC, Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan, R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan, Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan, The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan, Torque Tools Inc Health Plan, UPS Health and Welfare Plan, Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan, filed. (Attachments: #1 summons request, #2 summons request, #3 summons request, #4 summons request, #5 summons request, #6 summons request, #7 summons request, #8 summons request, #9 summons request, #10 summons request, #11 summons request, #12 summons request, #13 summons request, #14 summons request, #15 summons request, #16 summons request, #17 summons request, #18 summons request, #19 summons request, #20 summons request, #21 summons request, #22 summons request, #23 summons request, #24 summons request, #25 summons request, #26 summons request, #27 summons request, #28 summons request, #29 summons request, #30 summons request, #31 summons request, #32 summons request, #33 summons request, #34 summons request, #35 summons request, #36 summons request, #37 summons request, #38 summons request, #39 summons request, #40 summons request)(Ebad, Khan)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28315367) filed by Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC D/B/A 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ebad, Khan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC v. Aetna, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou, LLC D/B/A 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory
Represented By: Khan Ebad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diagnostic Affiliates of Northeast Hou,LLC doing business as 24 Hour Covid RT-PCR Laboratory
Represented By: Khan Ebad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna, Inc.
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Better Health of Texas Inc
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health And Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Inc.
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Insurance Company
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Management, LLC
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritain Health, Inc.
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Health Life & Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Medical Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Master Trust
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation Cafeteria Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Defined Benefit Plans Master Trust
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Financial, Inc. Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ge Global Health Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GT Services LLC Medical Insurance
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman Corporation Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indorama Ventures Oxides, LLC Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linde Comprehensive Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyondell Chemical Co, Equistar Chemicals LP, And Houston Refining, LP Master Trust
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hermann Health System Flexible Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oprona, Inc. Dba Rosen USA, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Welfare Plan for Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Friedkin Group Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torque Tools Inc Health Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. Associates Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restated Zions Bancorp. Employee and Retiree Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accenture United States Group Health Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alight Solutions LLC Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc. Medical Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramco U. S. Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collabera Inc. 125 Benefit Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Testing Service Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPMG LLP Health Plans.
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann Eye Center PA Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paychex Business Solutions LLC Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & L Carriers Group Benefits Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sap America Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology Services Group, LLC Employee Benefits Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetra Tech, Inc. Fully Insured HMO Benefit Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinet Group, Inc.
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Consolidated Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aarthun Performance Group LTD Health Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agility Recovery Solutions, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Air Liquide Holdings INC. Health Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema INC. Health Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. V. Starr & Co. Health Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cemex, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Legal Benefits Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Enterprises, Inc. Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte & Touche Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enercon Services, Inc. Employee Health & Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Corporation Companies' Bargaining Employees' Welfare Benefit Trust
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Bancshares, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Inc. And Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Health Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infosys BPM Limited Health Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inframark, LLC Welfare Benefit Wrap Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Cellulose Corporation Health Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invesco Health Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iqvia Inc. Health Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Iron Mountain Companies Welfare Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawler Foods, LTD. Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Leidos Employee Health and Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation Basic Benefit Plan For Hourly Employees
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mccombs Enterprises Health Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric U.S. Companies Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nustar Omnibus Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corporation Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opko Health, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol USA Holdings Corporation-Welfare Plans
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shi International Corp. Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snap-on incorporated Non-Union Retiree Health and Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transwestern Commercial Services Comprehensive Health And Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity University Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Marsh Rice University Health And Welfare Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decypher Technologies Employee Benefits Plan
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oprona, Inc. doing business as Rosen USA, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Seymour Costin
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Laura B. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?