Martin v. Busby et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Neal Martin
Defendant: Sheriff Larry Busby, Charlie Stroleny, Deputy Nowlan, Deputy Peerman and Deputy Salinas
Case Number: 2:2022cv00181
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Filing 17 Letter from Daniel Neal Martin, filed. (amireles, 2)
September 16, 2022 Filing 16 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on September 16, 2022(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(jmarks, 2)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: #10 Memorandum and Recommendations, (Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(jmarks, 2)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(amireles, 2)
August 29, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Appointment of CounselMotions referred to Jason B Libby. by Daniel Neal Martin, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Written Objection, #2 Envelope)(amireles, 2)
August 26, 2022 Filing 12 White Card Receipt Returned, executed on 8/5/2022 re: #6 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (AmandaOtto, 2)
August 22, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from Daniel Neal Martin re: 1983 Forms and request for public court records, filed. (amireles, 2) (amireles, 2).
August 18, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS ACTION re #1 Complaint Objections to M&R due by 9/1/2022(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(amireles, 2) Copy of M & R mailed with receipt card. Copy emailed to Manager of Three Strikes List.
August 15, 2022 Filing 9 MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Daniel Neal Martin, filed.(amireles, 2)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT as to Daniel Neal Martin. More Definite Statement due by 9/2/2022(Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee as to Daniel Neal Martin; granting #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (vrios, 2)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (vrios, 2)
August 1, 2022 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daniel Neal Martin, filed. (vrios, 2)
August 1, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Daniel Neal Martin, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2022. (vrios, 2) Modified on 8/2/2022 (vrios, 2).
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Daniel Neal Martin. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope)(vrios, 2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2022: #3 Cover Letter) (vrios, 2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Busby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Neal Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Larry Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Stroleny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Nowlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Peerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?