Tullis v. ExxonMobil Corporation
Plaintiff: Brian Tullis
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation
Case Number: 2:2022cv00192
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Julie K Hampton
Referring Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Stay Proceeding, filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jordan, David)
October 7, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Strike Plaintiff's Overbroad Collective Definition and Related Collective Allegations, filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Jordan, David)
October 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of ExxonMobil Corporation, filed. (McCombs, Katelyn)
October 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Miley on behalf of ExxonMobil Corporation, filed. (Miley, Sarah)
September 30, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Stay Proceeding filed by Brian Tullis. (Josephson, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Strike Plaintiff's Overbroad Collective Definition and Related Collective Allegations filed by Brian Tullis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Josephson, Michael)
September 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton, filed. All Parties are to appear by Zoom. Join ZoomGov Meetinghttps://www.zoomgov.com/j/1616735107Meeting ID: 161 673 5107One tap mobile+16692545252,,1616735107# US (San Jose)+16468287666,,1616735107# US (New York) (AnnSalazar, 2)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Reference. The Court refers this case to Magistrate Judge Julie K. Hampton.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(KelliePapaioannou, 2)
September 26, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery by Brian Tullis, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Dunlap, Andrew)
September 16, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Motion To Stay Proceedings by ExxonMobil Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memo and Order)(Fowler, Felicity)
September 14, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brian Tullis, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
September 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceeding by ExxonMobil Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jordan, David)
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and/or Strike Plaintiff's Overbroad Collective Definition and Related Collective Allegations by ExxonMobil Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jordan, David)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ExxonMobil Corporation, filed.(Jordan, David)
August 24, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Corin Johnson re: #4 Summons Issued/Not Issued, filed.(Dunlap, Andrew)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ExxonMobil Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to ExxonMobil Corporation, filed.(Dunlap, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ExxonMobil Corporation (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28614375) filed by Brian Tullis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Dunlap, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tullis v. ExxonMobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Tullis
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Represented By: Alyssa J White
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation
Represented By: Felicity Anne Fowler
Represented By: Katelyn Whitney McCombs
Represented By: David Bryce Jordan
Represented By: Sarah Jayne Miley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?