Belde v. Bio-Medical Applications of Texas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donna Belde
Defendant: Bio-Medical Applications of Texas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00277
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David S Morales
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Donna Belde, filed.(Gale, Christopher)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bio-Medical Applications of Texas, Inc. served on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023, filed.(Gale, Christopher)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(vrios, 2)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bio-Medical Applications of Texas, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29123369) filed by Donna Belde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gale, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belde v. Bio-Medical Applications of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Belde
Represented By: Christopher J Gale
Represented By: Amie Augenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bio-Medical Applications of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Dawn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?