United States of America v. Energy Transfer (R&M), LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Energy Transfer (R&M), LLC, El Paso, LLC and The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00214
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9613 CERCLA
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Joint MOTION to Reset Initial Pretrial Conference and Joint Report and Discovery/Case Management Plan Deadline ( Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 2/22/2024., Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(LeticiaGarza, 2)
October 12, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Reset Initial Pretrial Conference and Joint Report and Discovery/Case Management Plan Deadline by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frazier, Hannah)
September 25, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Energy Transfer (R&M), LLC identifying Energy Transfer LP as Corporate Parent, filed.(Pace, Caroline)
September 21, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by El Paso, LLC, filed.(Duewall, Craig)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Gregory Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Christopher J. Neumann to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for John Voorhees to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
September 20, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory Tan (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30539417) by El Paso, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2023. (Duewall, Craig)
September 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Neumann (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30539358) by El Paso, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2023. (Duewall, Craig)
September 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Voorhees (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30538941) by El Paso, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2023. (Duewall, Craig)
September 20, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to El Paso, LLC served on 9/11/2023, answer due 11/13/2023, filed. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service of Summons by El Paso)(Frazier, Hannah)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Energy Transfer (R&M), LLC served on 9/11/2023, answer due 11/13/2023, filed. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service of Summons by Energy Transfer)(Frazier, Hannah)
September 20, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company served on 9/11/2023, answer due 11/13/2023, filed. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service of Summons by Goodyear)(Frazier, Hannah)
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A. Duewall on behalf of El Paso, LLC, filed. (Duewall, Craig)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Frazier, Hannah)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Hannah Frazier to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie K Hampton) Parties notified.(JaredMarks, 2)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(ChristinaAvila, 2)
August 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hannah L. Frazier (Fee Exempt) by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2023. (Parker, Lisa Luz)
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Lisa Luz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Energy Transfer (R&M), LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lisa Luz Parker
Represented By: Hannah L. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Transfer (R&M), LLC
Represented By: Kelly Dick Brown
Represented By: Caroline Carter Pace
Represented By: Robert E Morse, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso, LLC
Represented By: John Voorhees
Represented By: Christopher J. Neumann
Represented By: Gregory R Tan
Represented By: Craig Alan Duewall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?