Cole v. Warden, S.C.P. Three Rivers
Petitioner: Stuart Clay Cole
Respondent: Warden, S.C.P. Three Rivers
Case Number: 2:2025cv00071
Filed: March 3, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Corpus Christi Office
Presiding Judge: Jason B Libby
Referring Judge: Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE, filed by Stuart Clay Cole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rad6)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $5.00 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, receipt number 6-201., filed. (rad6)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (kcc2)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (rad6)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (rad6)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby randomly selected to receive referrals. This case will be automatically referred to the randomly selected magistrate judge under the governing Special Order or divisional procedures. (rad6)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Corpus Christi Division. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (rad6)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Intradistrict Transfer to Corpus Christi, filed. (rad6)
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Case transferred in from Victoria Division on 03/10/2025 ; Case Number 6:25-cv-12. Case assigned to Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. filed by Stuart Clay Cole, Warden, S.C.P. Three Rivers. (rad6)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ****DISREGARD****CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (rad6) Modified on 3/6/2025 (rad6).
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Parties notified. Notice of Compliance due by 4/2/2025, filed. (rad6)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE of Exclusion, filed. (rad6)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (rad6)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5-NOT PAID) filed by Stuart Clay Cole. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Envelope) (rad6)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby randomly selected to receive referrals. This case will be automatically referred to the randomly selected magistrate judge under the governing Special Order or divisional procedures. (rad6)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Warden, S.C.P. Three Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stuart Clay Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, S.C.P. Three Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?