Lowery et al v. Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: 1884 Old Gavleston News Bldg, Bertini Brothers, LLC, Mansel Stanley, Ben Peterek, Karen Ellison, William Donovan, Brian Lowery, Gail Renee Harden, Deloris Farroux, Gary Praker, Judy Saracco, Roger Baker, Kelley Moon, William R. Rice, Sherwin Smith, Kattie B Bazar, Gene Ellison, John Saracco, Sr, Andrew Schaser, Sharon Donovan, Erma Saracco, George Saracco, Karen Cole, Raymond C Dalehite, Temella Baker, Maria L Gomez, Meliton Gomez, Marsha Millstid, Carinn Baker, Ruth Kane, Michael Davison, Estate of Ethellen Harden, Siow Lian Ong, Jennifer Phipps, Betty J Williamson, John Bordelon, Paul N Bazar, Zachary Taylor, Gerise Kemp, Angela Lowery, Alfredo Mamani, Laura M Bordelon, Diana Davison, Barbara Funderburk, Michael G Medwedeff, Debbie Delgado, Estate of Vera Young, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, Marie Celeste Dalehite, Gracie Reese, Jeffrey Pye, Sharon Praker, Susan Mardis, Peter Charnock, John Williamson, Mary Medwedeff, Jeff Kemp, Patricia Gonzalez, Teresa Pye, Cayce Weems, Henry Farroux, Maureen Boyer(Leedy) and Judith Dubose
Defendant: Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00450
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Galveston Office
County: Galveston
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 42:4000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 109 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Michelle Benavides re: #108 Order, filed. (SamanthaWarda, 4)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER. All Claims by Plaintiffs, Andrew Schaser and Jennifer Phipps are hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER; all claims by Plaintiffs are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
September 18, 2017 Filing 106 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (As to Plaintiffs, Mary Medwedeff and Michael G. Medwedeff Only) by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aguda, Joseph)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER (Settlement completion due by 9/28/2017), Case terminated on 9/6/17(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
September 6, 2017 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/6/2017. The Court will enter a Conditional Order of Dismissal, as stated on the record. Appearances:Keith Detweiler; Plaintiff's counsel did not appear.(Digital # 10:14 - 10:17)(ERO:Andy Gould), filed.(dperez, 3)
September 5, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. Please call the conference line at 409-763-7801 ten minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a landline. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. (jegonzalez, 3)
July 19, 2017 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/19/2017. If the case has not been closed, the parties are to file a letter with the Court setting out the status by August 23, 2017. Appearances: Martin L Mayo, Keith Michael Detweiler, Bradley K Jones.(ERO:Donna Wilkerson), filed.(agould, 3)
July 12, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 7/19/2017 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. Please call the conference line at 409-763-7801 ten minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Once you call the number, you will be connected to the meet-me-line; there will be silence so please hold until the Case Manager calls in to connect all parties. Everyone must be on a landline. No cell phones or speaker phones are permitted. (jegonzalez, 3)
July 5, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge George C Hanks, Jr, pursuant to General Order No. 2016-15. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect. Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (lusmith, 3)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #96 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff, William R. Rice Only (G-10-mc-7042) against Fidelity National Insurance Company,...*** William R. Rice terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #97 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiffs, Meliton Gomez and Maria L. Gomez Only (G-10-mc-7014) against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company,...**** Maria L Gomez and Meliton Gomez terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
March 7, 2017 Filing 97 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Plaintiffs, Meliton Gomez and Maria L. Gomez Only) by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Detweiler, Keith)
March 7, 2017 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Plaintiff, William R. Rice Only) by Fidelity National Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #92 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff, Sherwin Smith Only (G-10-mc-7030) against Fidelity National Insurance Company, Sherwin Smith terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #93 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiffs, Roger Baker, Tamella Baker and Carin Baker Only (G-10-mc-7023) against Fidelity National Insurance Company,...*** Temella Baker, Carinn Baker and Roger Baker terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
February 22, 2017 Filing 93 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Plaintiffs, Roger Baker, Tamella Baker and Carin Baker Only) by Fidelity National Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
February 21, 2017 Filing 92 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Plaintiff, Sherwin Smith Only) by Fidelity National Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #90 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff Reitmeyer Professional Building only (G-10-mc-7003) against Fidelity National Insurance Company...****, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
February 20, 2017 Filing 90 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Plaintiff Reitmeyer Professional Building only) by Fidelity National Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #88 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Karen Cole(G-10-mc-7017) against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Co,...*** Karen Cole terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
February 9, 2017 Filing 88 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Karen Cole and Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Co, filed.(sanderson, 3)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #86 Rule 41(a) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by [Maureen Boyer(Leedy)and Defendant, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company] [ G-10-mc-7044],...*** Maureen Boyer(Leedy) terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
January 9, 2017 Filing 86 Rule 41(a) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by [Maureen Boyer(Leedy)and Defendant, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company] [ G-10-mc-7044], Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed.(sanderson, 3)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite [ G-10-mc-7035] and Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
May 31, 2016 Filing 84 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2016. (sanderson, 3)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #80 Rule 41(a) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Plaintiff, Bertini Brothers LLC [Only] [ G-10-mc-7005] against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company...., Bertini Brothers LLC terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #79 Rule 41(a) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Plaintiff, Bertini Brothers LLC [Only] [ G-10-mc-7006] against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company...., Bertini Brothers, LLC terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Rule 41(a) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Plaintiff, Mansel Standley and Estate of Vera M Young [Only] [ G-10-mc-7028] against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company...., Mansel Stanley and Estate of Vera M Young terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
May 5, 2016 Filing 80 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice [Plaintiff, Bertini Brothers, LLC, and Defendant, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company] by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
May 5, 2016 Filing 79 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice [Plaintiff, Bertini Brothers, LLC, and Defendant, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company] by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
May 5, 2016 Filing 78 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice [Plaintiffs, Mansel Standley and Estate of Vera Young, and Defendant, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company] by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINON AND ORDER denying #71 Motion to Recuse; denying #74 Motion for ORal Hearing.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Rule 41(a) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Plaintiffs, George Saracco and Erma Saracco [Only] G-10-mc-7004 against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company..... *** Erma Saracco and George Saracco terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
January 29, 2015 Filing 75 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice [Plaintiffs, George Saracco and Erma Saracco Only] by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
December 11, 2014 Filing 74 MOTION for Oral Hearing re: #71 MOTION Motion to Recuse by Carinn Baker, Roger Baker, Temella Baker, Bertini Brothers, LLC, Maureen Boyer(Leedy), Karen Cole, Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite, Diana Davison, Michael Davison, Estate of Vera Young, Maria L Gomez, Meliton Gomez, Mary Medwedeff, Michael G Medwedeff, Jeffrey Pye, Teresa Pye, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, William R. Rice, Andrew Schaser, Sherwin Smith, Mansel Stanley, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2015. (Mayo, Martin)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Ruth Kane G-10-mc-7027 ... *** Plaintiff Ruth Kane terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
December 5, 2014 Filing 72 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Ruth Kane, filed.(sanderson, 3)
October 31, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION Motion to Recuse by Carinn Baker, Roger Baker, Temella Baker, Bertini Brothers, LLC, Maureen Boyer(Leedy), Karen Cole, Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite, Diana Davison, Michael Davison, Estate of Vera Young, Maria L Gomez, Meliton Gomez, Ruth Kane, Mary Medwedeff, Michael G Medwedeff, Jeffrey Pye, Teresa Pye, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, William R. Rice, Andrew Schaser, Sherwin Smith, Mansel Stanley, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Martin)
July 7, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Treas, William)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, and Patricia Gonzalez, Alfredo Mamani G-10-mc-7002 ...****, Patricia Gonzalez and Alfredo Mamani terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
May 6, 2014 Filing 68 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, and Patricia Gonzalez, Alfredo Mamani G-10-mc-7002 , filed.(sanderson, 3)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Ins Co and Judith Dubose G-10-mc-7034 ,...**** Judith Dubose terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
April 11, 2014 Filing 66 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Ins Co and Judith Dubose G-10-mc-7034 , filed.(sanderson, 3)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice , of Fidelity National Property and Casualty Ins Co and Judith Dubose G-10-mc-7033 (Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
April 11, 2014 Filing 64 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Judith Dubose (G-10-mc-7033), filed.(sanderson, 3)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #62 MOTION/STIPULATION for Rule 41(a) Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, John Bordelon, Laura M Bordelon (G-10-mc-7029)...***, John Bordelon and Laura M Bordelon terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
December 19, 2013 Filing 62 MOTION/STIPULATION for Rule 41(a) Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, John Bordelon, Laura M Bordelon, filed.(sanderson, 3)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Dismissal as to Zachary Taylor, with prejudice, against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company (G-10-mc-7029)(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
November 5, 2013 Filing 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Zachary Taylor and by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motin for Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by John Williamson and Betty J. Williamson (G-10-mc-7039) as to Fidelity Nat'l Pro & Cas Ins Co.....**** Betty J Williamson and John Williamson terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)
October 15, 2013 Filing 58 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by John Williamson and Betty J. Williamson and by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 (PARTIAL) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - case settled as to Zachary Taylor terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, 3)**** Zachary Taylor terminated pursuant to filing of Order of Dismissal (set settled) in G-10-mc-7029 *** Party
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Rule 41(a) STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal as to Barbara Funderburk, with prejudice, against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company (G-10-mc-7020), Barbara Funderburk terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
August 30, 2013 Filing 55 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Barbara Funderburk by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
August 7, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of attorney substitution by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company. Attorney Michelle Benavides terminated, filed. (Pair, Lisa)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company and Kelly Moon (G-10-mc-7020), Kelley Moon terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kelly Moon and by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
June 7, 2013 *** P/email notification from Pltf & Dft - case has settled between Pltf Kelly Moon and Dft Fidelity Nat'l Prop & Cas Ins Co *** Parties informed to file Notice of Dismissal in Lead Case No. G-10-cv-450 & Misc Case No. 10-mc-7020 upon finalizing settlement documents, filed. (sanderson, )
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 Rule 41(a) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems G-10-mc-7013 , Cayce Weems terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #46 Rule 41(a) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems G-10-mc-7012 (Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #45 Rule 41(a) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems G-10-mc-7011 (Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Rule 41(a) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems G-10-mc-7010 (Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
May 16, 2013 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
May 16, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
May 16, 2013 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Treas, William)
May 16, 2013 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Cayce Weems, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
February 8, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE re: Objections to Exhibit/Witness Lists held on 2/8/2013. Appearances: Martin L Mayo, William Ross DeJean, William T Treas., filed.(sanderson, )*** Issue discussed with Court. Parties to call Court on 2/15 if issue cannot be resolved.
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Gail Renee Harden and Estate of Ethellen Harden (G-10-mc-7024) against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company,(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
January 23, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2013. Appearances: Martin L Mayo, William Ross DeJean, William T Treas., filed.(sanderson, ))***Deadlines discussed in 1) G-10-mc-7002 (Patricia Gonzales & Alfred Mamani); 2) G-10-mc-7020 ( Kelly Moon); 3) G-10-mc-7032 (John & Laura M. Bordelon); 4) G-10-mc-7041 (Siow Lian Ong); 5) G-10-mc-7004 (George & Erma Saracco) & G-11-cv-121 (Panama Historic v. Hartford)....***Parties to revert back via email with potential trial dates for all cases except 10-mc-7004 (Saracco)......G-10-mc-7004 (George & Erma Saracco set for Bench Trial 4/10/13. Ntc to follow
January 22, 2013 Filing 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Estate of Ethellen Harden, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Gail Renee Harden, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeJean, William)
December 5, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/5/2012. Appearances:Kim Tran Britt. Martin L Mayo., filed.(sanderson, )***Deadlines discussed in 10-mc-7043( Millstid v. Fidelity) & 10-mc-7026 (Peterk v. Fidelity). Order to follow.
December 3, 2012 Filing 41 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
November 30, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/30/2012. Appearances: Martin L Mayo, William Ross DeJean, John Dennis Carter, William T Treas., filed.(sanderson, )*** Status of miscellaneous case G-10-mc-7009, G-10-mc-7015 & G-10-mc-7003 discussed with Court.
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Pltfs against Dft Fidelity....**** Kattie B Bazar and Paul N Bazar terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
November 21, 2012 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, Kattie B Bazar, Paul N Bazar, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeJean, William)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Deloris Farroux and Henry Farroux against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company...**** Deloris Farroux and Henry Farroux terminated(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
October 30, 2012 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Deloris Farroux, Henry Farroux, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Verdigets, Jason)
October 29, 2012 *** P/email notification from Pltf - case has settled between Pltf Gail Renee Harden and the Estate of Ethellen Harden and Dft Fidelity Nat'l Prop & Cas Ins Co *** Parties informed to file Notice of Dismissal in Lead Case No. G-10-cv-450 & Misc Case No. 10-mc-7024 upon finalizing settlement documents, filed. (sanderson, )
October 19, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/19/2012. Appearances: Samuel Bearman, Martin L Mayo, William Ross DeJean, John Dennis Carter, William T Treas. Brad Jones. Jason Verdigets. Kim Tran., filed.(sanderson, )*** Status of setting miscellaneous case for trial discussed with Court.
October 18, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified.... *** Telephone Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner, filed. (sanderson, ) ***The Parties should call the Courts conference line at (713) 250-5859, at the designated time.
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Joint Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Gene Ellison, Karen Ellison, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company - settled(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
August 14, 2012 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Joint) by Gene Ellison, Karen Ellison, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeJean, William)
June 25, 2012 *** P/phone call & email notification from Pltf & Dft - case has settled between Pltfs Gene & Karen Ellison and Dft Fidelity Nat'l Prop & Cas Ins Co *** Parties informed to file Notice of Dismissal in Lead Case No. G-10-cv-450 & Misc Case No. 10-mc-7022 upon finalizing settlement documents, filed. (sanderson, )
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED ORDER - in an effort to correct a typographical error, it is ORDERED granting Rule 41(a) JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by John Sr. and Judy Saracco, 1884 Old Galveston News Building against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, a corporation - settled(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Rule 41(a) JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by John Sr. and Judy Saracco, 1884 Old Galveston News Building against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, a corporation - settled(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
May 18, 2012 Filing 31 Rule 41(a) JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by John Sr. and Judy Saracco, 1884 Old Galveston News Building, Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, a corporation, filed.(sanderson, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice, of Pltf Jeff G.W. Kemp against Dft Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
October 18, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss, without prejudice, against Dft Fidelity National Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Jeff Kemp, filed. (sanderson, )
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that preparation and copying of files of Hal Lovato of TOP Construction to be paid in accordance with this Order.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
October 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/7/2011. Appearances: Martin L Mayo, Michelle Benavides, John Dennis Carter, William T Treas., filed..... Payment of fees to Hal Lovato discussed with Court. Order to follow(sanderson, )
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Atty Samuel W Bearman for all Pltfs.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION for Samuel W. Bearman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gene Ellison, Karen Ellison, Estate of Ethellen Harden, Estate of Vera Young, Deloris Farroux, Henry Farroux, Barbara Funderburk, Maria L Gomez, Meliton Gomez, Patricia Gonzalez, Gail Renee Harden, Ruth Kane, Gerise Kemp, Jeff Kemp, Angela Lowery, Brian Lowery, Alfredo Mamani, Susan Mardis, Mary Medwedeff, Michael G Medwedeff, Marsha Millstid, Kelley Moon, Siow Lian Ong, Ben Peterek, Jennifer Phipps, Gary Praker, Sharon Praker, Jeffrey Pye, Teresa Pye, Gracie Reese, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, William R. Rice, Erma Saracco, George Saracco, John Saracco, Sr, Judy Saracco, 1884 Old Gavleston News Bldg, Carinn Baker, Roger Baker, Temella Baker, Kattie B Bazar, Paul N Bazar, Bertini Brothers, LLC, John Bordelon, Laura M Bordelon, Maureen Boyer(Leedy), Peter Charnock, Karen Cole, Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite, Diana Davison, Michael Davison, Debbie Delgado, Sharon Donovan, William Donovan, Judith Dubose, Andrew Schaser, Sherwin Smith, Mansel Stanley, Zachary Taylor, Cayce Weems, Betty J Williamson, John Williamson, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2011. (Mayo, Martin)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the Parties SHALL submit a Joint Status Report by 7/15/2011.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to Sever and Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice insofar as it seeks a severance; and DENIED insofar as it seeks dismissal, without prejudice to it being reurged, without refiling, following the filing of the Plaintiffs Amended Complaints..(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Prior to the entry of the Order for Administration of Case on April 25, 2011, Plaintiff, Gary W. Praker, had been removed from this action by the filing of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. A miscellaneous file was erroneously opened to reflect the claims of the originally named Plaintiff.It is, therefore, ORDERED that Civil Action No. G-10-mc-7038 is DISMISSED as improvidently opened....***, Gary Praker terminated.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Prior to the entry of the Order for Administration of Case on April 25, 2011, Co-Plaintiffs Debbie Delgado and Sharon Praker had been removed from this action by the filing of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. A miscellaneous file was erroneously opened to reflect the claims of these originally named Plaintiffs.It is, therefore, ORDERED that Civil Action No. G-10-mc-7036 is DISMISSED as improvidently opened....****, Debbie Delgado and Sharon Praker terminated.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(sanderson, )
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for administration of case.(Signed by Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner) Parties notified.(ccarnew, )
April 20, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Treas on behalf of Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Treas, William)
April 11, 2011 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company served on 4/5/2011, answer due 6/6/2011, filed.(Gaut, Jennifer)
April 5, 2011 Filing 18 Supplemental AMENDED against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company filed by Marsha Millstid.(Mayo, Martin)
February 28, 2011 Filing 17 Supplemental AMENDED Complaint against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company filed by William R. Rice.(Mayo, Martin)
November 29, 2010 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, filed by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company. (Carter, John)
November 23, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Dennis Carter on behalf of Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Carter, John)
November 15, 2010 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims, filed by Karen Ellison, Estate of Ethellen Harden, Estate of Vera Young, Deloris Farroux, Henry Farroux, Barbara Funderburk, Maria L Gomez, Meliton Gomez, Patricia Gonzalez, Gail Renee Harden, Ruth Kane, Gerise Kemp, Jeff Kemp, Angela Lowery, Brian Lowery, Alfredo Mamani, Susan Mardis, Mary Medwedeff, Michael G Medwedeff, Kelley Moon, National Alliance Marketing Group, Inc., Siow Lian Ong, Ben Peterek, Jennifer Phipps, Jeffrey Pye, Teresa Pye, Gracie Reese, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, Erma Saracco, George Saracco, John Saracco, Sr, Judy Saracco, Andrew Schaser, Sherwin Smith, Mansel Stanley, 1884 Old Gavleston News Bldg, Carinn Baker, Roger Baker, Temella Baker, Kattie B Bazar, Paul N Bazar, Bertini Brothers, LLC, John Bordelon, Laura M Bordelon, Peter Charnock, Karen Cole, Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite, Diana Davison, Michael Davison, Debbie Delgado, Sharon Donovan, William Donovan, Judith Dubose, Gene Ellison, Zachary Taylor, Cayce Weems, Betty J Williamson, John Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Mayo, Martin)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner for all further proceedings.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(ccarnew, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed.(Benavides, Michelle)
October 28, 2010 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed.(Benavides, Michelle)
October 28, 2010 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed.(Benavides, Michelle)
October 25, 2010 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #8 MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Appendix)(Benavides, Michelle)
October 25, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' ClaimsMotions referred to John R Froeschner. by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benavides, Michelle)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John R Froeschner.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(lusmith, )
October 19, 2010 Case transferred in from Houston Division on 10/19/2010 ; Case Number 4:10-cv-2778.(ltien, )
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas Galveston Divison.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 5 First MOTION to Transfer Case to Galveston County by Brian Lowery, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2010. (Gaut, Jennifer)
October 5, 2010 Filing 4 First AMENDED Complaint against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company filed by Karen Ellison, Estate of Ethellen Harden, Estate of Vera Young, Deloris Farroux, Henry Farroux, Barbara Funderburk, Maria L Gomez, Meliton Gomez, Patricia Gonzalez, Gail Renee Harden, Ruth Kane, Gerise Kemp, Jeff Kemp, Angela Lowery, Brian Lowery, Alfredo Mamani, Susan Mardis, Mary Medwedeff, Michael G Medwedeff, Kelley Moon, 1884 Old Gavleston News Bldg, Carinn Baker, Roger Baker, Temella Baker, Kattie B Bazar, Paul N Bazar, Bertini Brothers, LLC, John Bordelon, Laura M Bordelon, Peter Charnock, Karen Cole, Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite, Diana Davison, Michael Davison, Sharon Donovan, William Donovan, Judith Dubose, Gene Ellison, Siow Lian Ong, Ben Peterek, Jennifer Phipps, Jeffrey Pye, Teresa Pye, Gracie Reese, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, Erma Saracco, George Saracco, John Saracco, Sr, Judy Saracco, Andrew Schaser, Sherwin Smith, Mansel Stanley, Zachary Taylor, Cayce Weems, Betty J Williamson, John Williamson.(Mayo, Martin)
August 21, 2010 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Karen Ellison, Estate of Ethellen Harden, Estate of Vera Young, Deloris Farroux, Henry Farroux, Maria L Gomez, Meliton Gomez, Patricia Gonzalez, Gail Renee Harden, Ruth Kane, Gerise Kemp, Jeff Kemp, Angela Lowery, Brian Lowery, Alfredo Mamani, Susan Mardis, Mary Medwedeff, Michael G Medwedeff, Kelley Moon, 1884 Old Gavleston News Bldg, Carinn Baker, Roger Baker, Temella Baker, Kattie B Bazar, Paul N Bazar, Bertini Brothers, LLC, John Bordelon, Laura M Bordelon, Peter Charnock, Karen Cole, Marie Celeste Dalehite, Raymond C Dalehite, Diana Davison, Michael Davison, Debbie Delgado, Sharon Donovan, William Donovan, Judith Dubose, Gene Ellison, Siow Lian Ong, Ben Peterek, Jennifer Phipps, Jeffrey Pye, Teresa Pye, Gracie Reese, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, Erma Saracco, George Saracco, John Saracco, Sr, Judy Saracco, Andrew Schaser, Sherwin Smith, Mansel Stanley, Zachary Taylor, Cayce Weems, Betty J Williamson, John Williamson, filed.(Mayo, Martin)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ltien, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-6742385) filed by John and Betty J. Williamson, Gary Praker, Ben Peterek, William and Sharon Donovan, Andrew Schaser and Jennifer Phipps, Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC, Gene and Karen Ellison, Brian and Angela Lowery, Roger, Temella and C Baker, Debbie Delgado and Sharon Praker, Henry and Deloris Farroux, Sherwin Smith, John and Laura M. Bordelon, Judith Dubose, Jeff and Gerise Kemp, John Saracco Sr., Judy Saracco and 1884 Old Galveston News Building, Zachary Taylor, Peter Charnock, Susan Mardis, Siow Lian Ong, Paul N. and Kattie B Bazar, Ruth Kane, Michael and Diana Davison, Mansel Stanley and the Estate of Vera Young, Marie Celeste and Ra Dalehite, Mary and Michael C. Medwedeff, George and Erma Saracco, Meliton and Maria L. Gomez, Karen Cole, Kelley Moon, Cayce Weems, Bertini Brothers, LLC, Gracie Reese, Patricia Gonzalez and Alfredo Mamani, Gail Renee Harden an Harden, Jeffrey and Teresa Pye.(Mayo, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery et al v. Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1884 Old Gavleston News Bldg
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertini Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansel Stanley
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Peterek
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ellison
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Donovan
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lowery
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Renee Harden
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Farroux
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Praker
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Saracco
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Baker
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Moon
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Rice
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherwin Smith
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kattie B Bazar
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Ellison
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Saracco, Sr
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Schaser
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Donovan
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erma Saracco
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Saracco
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Cole
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond C Dalehite
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temella Baker
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria L Gomez
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meliton Gomez
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Millstid
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carinn Baker
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Kane
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Davison
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ethellen Harden
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siow Lian Ong
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Phipps
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty J Williamson
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bordelon
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul N Bazar
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Taylor
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerise Kemp
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lowery
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Mamani
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura M Bordelon
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Davison
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Funderburk
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Medwedeff
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Delgado
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Vera Young
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reitmeyer Professional Building, LLC
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Celeste Dalehite
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracie Reese
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Pye
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Praker
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Mardis
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Charnock
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Williamson
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Medwedeff
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Kemp
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Gonzalez
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Pye
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cayce Weems
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Farroux
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Boyer(Leedy)
Represented By: William T Treas
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Represented By: William Ross DeJean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Dubose
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: Samuel Bearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Joseph J Aguda, Jr
Represented By: William T Treas
Represented By: John Dennis Carter
Represented By: Michelle Benavides
Represented By: Martin L. Mayo
Represented By: William Ross DeJean
Represented By: Lisa Marie Pair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?