Aurora Loan Services LLC v. Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Defendant: Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, Joyce Martel, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc doing business as New Heights Venture and American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Counter Claimant: Mancuso Chair Group, Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00226
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Galveston Office
County: Galveston
Presiding Judge: Gregg Costa, US District Judge
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #46 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice.(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #47 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice.(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
July 23, 2012 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Aurora Loan Services LLC, Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Joyce Martel, New Heights Venture, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., filed.(dwilkerson, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 46 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice (Joint) by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Aurora Loan Services LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Treas, William)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 6/4/12(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(ccarnew, )
June 4, 2012 Filing 44 Email from Patrick Joost re: settlement, filed. (ccarnew, )
May 25, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Docket Call set for 7/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom before Judge Gregg Costa, filed. (dkelly, )
May 18, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Reassignment. Pursuant to General Order No. 2012-5, this case is reassigned to Judge Gregg Costa. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect. Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dkellyadi, )
March 19, 2012 Disbursement of Registry Funds to Joyce Martel in the amount of $21,247.92 on 3/8/2012 re: #41 Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Funds, filed. (knguyen, )
March 19, 2012 Disbursement of Registry Funds to Aurora Loan Services, LLC in the amount of $21,247.92 on 3/8/2012 re: #41 Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Funds, filed. (knguyen, )
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Withdrawal of Funds.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(ccarnew, )
February 16, 2012 Filing 40 Agreed MOTION for Withdrawal of Funds by Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Joyce Martel, New Heights Venture, Old Galveston Villas Community Association, Inc, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2012: #3 Proposed Order).
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(ccarnew, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Old, James)
September 21, 2011 Filing 37 ANSWER to #34 Counterclaim by Aurora Loan Services LLC, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
September 15, 2011 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by TEXAS WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCITION in the amount of $42,495.13, receipt number HOU016559 re: #33 Financial Order (REGARDING REGISTRY FUNDS), filed. (ejones, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 36 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to American Strategic Insurance Corporation, executed on June 6, 2011 by Texas Dept of Insurance, filed. (ltrevino, )
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(lusmith, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 34 COUNTERCLAIM and CROSS CLAIM OF Interpleader against Aurora Loan Services LLC filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.(ltrevino, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Leave to File Interpleader Claim and Deposit Funds into Registry of the Court.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(ltrevino, )
August 29, 2011 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION for Leave to File Interpleader Claim filed by Aurora Loan Services LLC. (Lehtola, Patricia)
August 29, 2011 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER on Rule 12(B)1 Motion to Dismiss re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, filed.(Woods, Keith)
August 26, 2011 Filing 30 CLERKS NOTICE on Mandatory Electronic Filing re: #28 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss, #29 Initial Disclosures. Party notified, filed. (rsmith)
August 26, 2011 Filing 29 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Joyce Martel, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., filed.(rsmith)
August 26, 2011 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, filed by Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Joyce Martel, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc.. (rsmith, )
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER for Expedited Response; Motion-related deadline set re: #22 MOTION for Leave to File Interpleader Claim Responses due by 8/30/2011.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(ltrevino, )
August 24, 2011 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Patricia B. Lehtola re: #25 Response to Motion, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, #2 Exhibit Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Exh 3)(Lehtola, Patricia)
August 24, 2011 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Aurora Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, #2 Exhibit Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Exh 3)(Lehtola, Patricia)
August 23, 2011 Filing 24 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Aurora Loan Services LLC, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
August 22, 2011 Filing 23 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Aurora Loan Services LLC, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
August 22, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Interpleader Claim by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion for Leave to File Interpleader Claim, #2 Exhibit Motion to File Interpleader Claim)(Old, James)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOLLOWING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/17/11. Appearances: Jay Fancher. Appearances: Bradley K Jones, Patricia Beaujean Lehtola, Keith Landis Woods. ETT: 4-5 Days. Jury Trial. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 2/1/2012. Pltf Expert Report due by 2/1/2012 Deft Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2012. Deft Expert Report due by 3/1/2012 Discovery due by 5/1/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/20/2012. Initial Disclosures due by 9/10/2011 Docket Call set for 7/16/2012 at 09:30 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom, Galveston, TX before Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(lusmith, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Old Galveston Villas Community Association, Inc., Joyce Martel, Jerry Mancuso, and Mancuso Chair Group, Inc., filed.(jhancock)
August 16, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley K. Jones on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed. (Jones, Bradley)
August 5, 2011 Filing 18 Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Aurora Loan Services LLC, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
August 3, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Joyce Martel, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2011. (lcampbell)
August 1, 2011 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aurora Loan Services LLC by Jerry Mancuso, Joyce Martel, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., filed.(lfilmore, )
July 25, 2011 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mancuso Chair Group, Inc served on 6/23/2011, answer due 8/22/2011, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
July 25, 2011 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jerry Mancuso served on 6/23/2011, answer due 8/22/2011, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
July 25, 2011 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Joyce Martel served on 5/26/2011, answer due 6/16/2011, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
July 25, 2011 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc. served on 6/7/2011, answer due 6/28/2011, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
July 25, 2011 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Texas Windstorm Insurance Association served on 5/31/2011, answer due 6/21/2011, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
July 25, 2011 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Strategic Insurance Corporation served on 5/31/2011, answer due 6/21/2011, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
June 29, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed.(Old, James)
June 24, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas D. D'Arche and Michelle Benavides on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed. (Benavides, Michelle)
June 22, 2011 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corporation identifying American Strategic Insurance Corp. American Strategic Insurance Underwriters as Corporate Parent, filed.(Treas, William)
June 22, 2011 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed.(Treas, William)
June 21, 2011 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed.(Old, James)
May 31, 2011 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aurora Loan Services LLC, filed.(Lehtola, Patricia)
May 16, 2011 Filing 3 EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint, by Aurora Loan Services LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Lehtola, Patricia)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 8/17/2011 at 08:15 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt) Parties notified.(lusmith, )
May 16, 2011 Summons Issued as to American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed.(lusmith, )
May 16, 2011 Summons Issued as to Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Joyce Martel, Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed.(lusmith, )
May 13, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Jerry Mancuso, Mancuso Chair Group, Inc, Joyce Martel, Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, old galveston villas property owners association, inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-8077238) filed by Aurora Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Lehtola, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aurora Loan Services LLC v. Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Windstorm Insurance Association
Represented By: James R Old, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Martel
Represented By: Keith Landis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Galveston Villas Property Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Landis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Mancuso
Represented By: Keith Landis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mancuso Chair Group, Inc doing business as New Heights Venture
Represented By: Keith Landis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Represented By: William T Treas
Represented By: Michelle Benavides
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mancuso Chair Group, Inc
Represented By: Keith Landis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Patricia Beaujean Lehtola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?