T&T Offshore, Inc. v. Lightering, LLC et al
Plaintiff: T&T OFFSHORE, INC. and T&T Offshore Inc
Defendant: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY, LIGHTERING, LLC F/K/A LIGHTERING LLC, TT CLUB MUTUAL INSURANCE LTD, XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AGCS MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY MARKETED AS ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY, XL Speciality Insurance Company, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Lightering LLC and TT Club Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00265
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Compliance by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Lightering LLC, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, TT Club Mutual Insurance Company, XL Speciality Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meyer, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Fitzhugh III on behalf of T&T Offshore Inc, filed. (Noe Wilson, Susan)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on Clarification terminating #15 . The court intended "its underwriting files and related policies" to include those from 2014 and 2015. By 10/26/2018, Lightering must produce its 2014 and 2015 underwriting files and insurance policies. T&T Offshore interpreted the summary judgment deadline correctly. Neither party is required to move for summary judgment, but if either did, it has been required to do so by 11/1/2018. As Lightering has not yet given T&T Offshore all of its underwriting files and related policies, the parties may now move for summary judgment by 11/9/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Clarification as to #9 Order, by T&T Offshore Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Trachtenberg, Mark)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Discovery ORDER. The parties' discovery plan is accepted #11 . By 11/14/2018, the parties must complete their discovery plan. Internal review set for 11/19/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 First AMENDED ANSWER to #1 , by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, XL Speciality Insurance Company, filed. (ghassan, 4)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on Leave. The defendants' amended answer is accepted #10 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 ADVISORY by T&T Offshore Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Vining, Robert)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, XL Speciality Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Lisa)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Discovery ORDER. By 10/15/2018, the parties must jointly report what they want to learn and from whom. By 10/18/2018, Lightering must give T&T Offshore its underwriting files and related policies. By 10/18/2018, T&T Offshore must give its invoices to Lightering. By 11/1/2018, each party may move for summary judgment. Internal review set for 11/5/2018. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Management ORDER entered in civil action 4:18-161. On the oral motion of Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, and XL Specialty Insurance Company, civil action G-18-265, T&T Offshore, Inc. v. Lightering, LLC, et al., is transferred to Judge Lynn N. Hughes #7 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, XL Speciality Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Watson, Harold)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by TT Club Mutual Insurance Company, filed.(Nork, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by T&T Offshore Inc, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Lightering LLC, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, XL Speciality Insurance Company, filed.(Kaufmann, Lisa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Bell, David G. Meyer on behalf of Lightering LLC, filed. (Meyer, David)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20821242) filed by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY, AGCS MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY MARKETED AS ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T&T Offshore, Inc. v. Lightering, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T&T OFFSHORE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T&T Offshore Inc
Represented By: Michael W Hogue
Represented By: Maxwell Lane Lowrey
Represented By: Susan D Noe Wilson
Represented By: Evan T Caffrey
Represented By: Mark Ryan Trachtenberg
Represented By: Thomas C Fitzhugh, III
Represented By: Claude L Stuart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: Harold K. Watson
Represented By: Lisa Marie Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIGHTERING, LLC F/K/A LIGHTERING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT CLUB MUTUAL INSURANCE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Harold K. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCS MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY MARKETED AS ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY
Represented By: Harold K. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: Harold K. Watson
Represented By: Lisa Marie Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Harold K. Watson
Represented By: Lisa Marie Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightering LLC
Represented By: Michael K Bell
Represented By: David Gregory Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT Club Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas R Nork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?