U.S. Bank NA, as trustee v. XSV Industries, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, ASuccessor to Bank of America, N.A., Successor in Interest to Lasalle Bank, N.A., as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secu and U.S. Bank NA, successor trustee to Bank of America NA, successor in interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Tr
Defendant: XSV Industries, LLC, Village of Emerald Bay Homeowners Association, Inc. and FIG Trust
Case Number: 3:2018cv00301
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to FIG Trust served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018, filed.(Hord, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST for Entry of Default against XSV Industries, LLC by U.S. Bank NA, successor trustee to Bank of America NA, successor in interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Tr, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint,, by U.S. Bank NA, successor trustee to Bank of America NA, successor in interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Tr, filed.(Hord, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Entry of Agreed Judgment as to Defendant Village of Emerald Bay Homeowners Association, Inc. by U.S. Bank NA, successor trustee to Bank of America NA, successor in interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Tr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Village of Emerald Bay Homeowners Association, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018, filed.(mmapps, 4)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Entry of Order re: Entry of Agreed Judgment as to Defendant FIG Trust by U.S. Bank NA, successor trustee to Bank of America NA, successor in interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Tr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank NA, successor trustee to Bank of America NA, successor in interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Tr, filed.(Hord, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Summons Issued as to FIG Trust, Village of Emerald Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., XSV Industries, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to XSV Industries, LLC, filed.(Hord, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to FIG Trust, filed.(Hord, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Village of Emerald Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., filed.(Hord, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIG Trust, Village of Emerald Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., XSV Industries, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20973313) filed by U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, ASuccessor to Bank of America, N.A., Successor in Interest to Lasalle Bank, N.A., as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hord, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank NA, as trustee v. XSV Industries, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XSV Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Emerald Bay Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIG Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee, ASuccessor to Bank of America, N.A., Successor in Interest to Lasalle Bank, N.A., as Trustee, on Behalf of the Holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secu
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank NA, successor trustee to Bank of America NA, successor in interest to Lasalle Bank National Association, as trustee, on behalf of the holders of the Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Tr
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Represented By: Eric Craig Mettenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?