Fiddick v. Bay Area Credit Service, LLC

Plaintiff: Daniel G. Fiddick
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00416
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Bay Area Credit Service, LLC served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Daniel G. Fiddick, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to Bay Area Credit Service, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bay Area Credit Service, LLC, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 Other EXHIBITS by Daniel G. Fiddick, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Volheim, Nathan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Daniel G. Fiddick, filed. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Daniel G. Fiddick, filed. (Volheim, Nathan)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bay Area Credit Service, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21409444) filed by Daniel G. Fiddick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiddick v. Bay Area Credit Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Fiddick
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?