Brown v. STP Nuclear Operating Co.

Plaintiff: Sharon Brown
Defendant: STP Nuclear Operating Co., City of San Antonio and City of Austin
Case Number: 3:2018cv00441
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference , filed by STP Nuclear Operating Co.. (Koronka, Kevin)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Cooper, Gordon)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Striking Document re: #4 MOTION to Remand for non-compliance with Local Rules and Hanks Procedures.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 ** STRICKEN ** MOTION to Remand by Sharon Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2019. (Cooper, Gordon) Modified on 1/22/2019 (dwilkerson, 3).
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by STP Nuclear Operating Co. identifying NRG South Texas, LP and City of Austin as Corporate Parent, filed.(Koronka, Kevin)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court Matagorda County, TX, case number 18-E-0637 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21526329) filed by STP Nuclear Operating Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit B-3, #6 Exhibit B-4, #7 Exhibit B-5, #8 Exhibit C)(Koronka, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. STP Nuclear Operating Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STP Nuclear Operating Co.
Represented By: Kevin Lynn Koronka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brown
Represented By: Gordon R Cooper, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?