United States Department of Justice v. Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd, et al.
Plaintiff: Attorney UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Defendant: James W Gartrell, Jr and Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00070
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. ETT: 6 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/24/2019 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 8/9/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 8/9/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 9/13/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 9/13/2019. Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/17/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/13/2020. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 3/27/2020. Docket Call set for 4/3/2020 at 03:00 PM in Sixth Floor Courtroom before Judge George C Hanks Jr. Case is subject to being called to trial on short notice duing May, 2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
May 15, 2019 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Initial conference held on May 15, 2019. The court and parties conferred and the court set out a schedule for the case. The scheduling order will be entered separately. Appearances: Ken Wall, Edward E. Hartline, Sara Lewenberg Niles, Elizabeth Frances Karpati. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulaton Regarding Discovery)(Niles, Sara)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Jyotpal Singh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George C. Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (dwilkerson, 3)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Edward E Hartline to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James W Gartrell, Jr, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd, filed.(Stallone, Joseph)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Edward E. Hartline to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2019. (Stallone, Joseph)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Jyotpal Singh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2019. (Stallone, Joseph)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(Niles, Sara)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd, filed.(Singh, Jyotpal)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed.(Niles, Sara)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Niles, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Department of Justice v. Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Gartrell, Jr
Represented By: Edward E. Hartline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tft Galveston Portfolios Ltd
Represented By: Jyotpal Singh
Represented By: Edward E. Hartline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Timothy J. Moran
Represented By: Sara Lewenberg Niles
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Karpati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?