Monroe v. Memorial Hermann Health System

Plaintiff: Catherine V. Monroe
Defendant: Memorial Hermann Health System
Case Number: 3:2019cv00162
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Setting as to #9 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #10 Document. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 10:15 AM in by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to the Court supplementing correspondence dated June 26, 2019 by Memorial Hermann Health System, filed.(Luccia, Frank)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Order)(Luccia, Frank)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER striking #7 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ***STRICKEN***MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Memorial Hermann Health System, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Luccia, Frank)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 6/27/2019.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Memorial Hermann Health System, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Luccia, Frank)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Memorial Hermann Health System served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019, filed.(bmendoza, 5)
May 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Memorial Hermann Health System. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Memorial Hermann Health System, filed.(Usoro, Okon)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Memorial Hermann Health System (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22386745) filed by Catherine V. Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Usoro, Okon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Memorial Hermann Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hermann Health System
Represented By: Frank N Luccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine V. Monroe
Represented By: Okon J Usoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?